This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:53:21 (UTC).

Monopoli et al v. Pinkfong USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Monopoli filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Pinkfong USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald S. Monopoli

Laura E. Monopoli

Don Monopoli Productions, Inc.

Defendants

Pinkfong USA, Inc.

Smart Study Co., Ltd.

Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John J. Griffin, Jr.

Attorney at Kay Griffin, PLLC

222 Second Avenue North, Suite 340-M

Nashville, TN 37201

John C. Herman

Attorney at Herman Jones LLP

3424 Peachtree Road, N.E., Suite 1650

Atlanta, GA 30326

Michael A. Johnson

Attorney at Kay Griffin, PLLC

222 Second Avenue North, Suite 340-M

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

Keane A. Barger

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

Timothy L. Warnock

Attorney at Riley, Warnock & Jacobson

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Initial Case Management Conference set for March 9, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby reset for April 4, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/8/2022. (bs) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#29

(#29) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Initial Case Management Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Griffin, John) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#28

(#28) DECLARATION of Jungho Choi filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC re: #24 Memorandum in Support, #23 MOTION to Transfer . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#27

(#27) DECLARATION of Yeonbin Jeong filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC re: #24 Memorandum in Support, #23 MOTION to Transfer . (Warnock, Timothy) Modified on 3/4/2022 (dt). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#26

(#26) DECLARATION of Cathy Merenda filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC re: #24 Memorandum in Support, #23 MOTION to Transfer . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

25 #4

Exhibit 3B - Wayback Screenshots Part 2

#24

(#24) MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 MOTION to Transfer filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Transfer by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC. (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/9/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons issued as to Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd. and Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC. (Service copies picked up by counsel.) (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

1 #3

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Trademark Application

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd. and Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3510591), filed by Donald S. Monopoli, Don Monopoli Productions, Inc., Laura E. Monopoli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trademark Application, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Initial Case Management Conference set for March 9, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby reset for April 4, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/8/2022. (bs) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Initial Case Management Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Griffin, John) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DECLARATION of Jungho Choi filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC re: #24 Memorandum in Support, #23 MOTION to Transfer . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DECLARATION of Yeonbin Jeong filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC re: #24 Memorandum in Support, #23 MOTION to Transfer . (Warnock, Timothy) Modified on 3/4/2022 (dt). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DECLARATION of Cathy Merenda filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC re: #24 Memorandum in Support, #23 MOTION to Transfer . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Ilene S. Farkas filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC re: #24 Memorandum in Support, #23 MOTION to Transfer , #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #22 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lyrical Comparison, #3 Exhibit 3A - Wayback Screenshots Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3B - Wayback Screenshots Part 2)(Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 MOTION to Transfer filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Transfer by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC. (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC . (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC. (Warnock, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Donald S. Monopoli. (Griffin, John) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/9/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd. and Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC. (Service copies picked up by counsel.) (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL John C. Herman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/1/2022. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketGA State Bar status verified as active for John C. Herman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for John J. Griffin, Jr and Michael A. Johnson admitted to this court. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pinkfong USA, Inc., Smart Study Co., Ltd. and Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3510591), filed by Donald S. Monopoli, Don Monopoli Productions, Inc., Laura E. Monopoli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trademark Application, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Smart Study Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy L. Warnock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keane A. Barger