This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2020 at 07:04:48 (UTC).

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. v. Dong et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Monolithic Power Systems, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Dong. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-06752

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendants

Wei Dong

Lin Sheng

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John P. Schnurer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

John Dudley Esterhay

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#14

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/14/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2021 11:00 AM in To Be Determined. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Judge Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#13) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc... (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. Lin Sheng served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. Wei Dong served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Lin Sheng. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Wei Dong. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 9/28/2020) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 9/28/2020) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 9/28/2020) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14996759.). Filed byMonolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 9/28/2020) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Esterhay