This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2022 at 07:04:03 (UTC).

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. et al v. Meraki Integrated Circuit(SHENZHEN) Technology, LTD.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Monolithic Power Systems, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Meraki Integrated Circuit SHENZHEN Technology, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey S. White and Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01986

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jeffrey S. White

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.

Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Meraki Intregrated Circuit (SHENZHEN) Technology, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Janice L. Ta

500 W 2Nd St 1900

Austin, TX 78701

John Dudley Esterhay

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

John P. Schnurer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

Michael J. Hoefling

1065 E. Morehead St.

Charlotte, NC 28204

David E. Stevens

Attorney at Johnston Alliston & Hord, PA

1065 East Morehead Street

Charlotte, NC 28204

John D. Esterhay

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Miguel J. Bombach

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

W. Matthew Pierce

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202

Janice Le Ta

Attorney at Vinson and Elkins LLP

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew J. Gray, IV

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Shaobin Zhu

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Winstol D Carter, Jr

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth M. Chiaviello

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

Eric Kraeutler

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Seth M. Gerber

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

2049 Century Park E, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#129

(#129) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE WITH RELATED CASE NO. 4:22-cv-01986 FOR PRE-TRIAL PURPOSES AND VACATE CURRENT CASE DEADLINES; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 24, 2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#128

(#128) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 13, 2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

127 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

127 #127

Main Document

#126

(#126) RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 13, 2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

125 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

125 #125

Main Document

#123

(#123) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meraki Intregrated Circuit (SHENZHEN) Technology, LTD... (Zhu, Shaobin) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#122

(#122) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd., Monolithic Power Systems, Inc... (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

6 #3

Exhibit C to Complaint

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice L. Ta on behalf of CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

#11

(#11) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases (Entered: 10/05/2020)

248 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE WITH RELATED CASE NO. 4:22-cv-01986 FOR PRE-TRIAL PURPOSES AND VACATE CURRENT CASE DEADLINES; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 24, 2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 13, 2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings re 126 Related Case Order. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 13, 2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docket(#124) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meraki Intregrated Circuit (SHENZHEN) Technology, LTD... (Zhu, Shaobin) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd., Monolithic Power Systems, Inc... (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docket(#121) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/13/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD.. (am) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to MERAKI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (SHENZHEN) TECHNOLOGY, LTD.. (am) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTACHMENT Attaching Exhibits to Complaint to #1 Complaint, by Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd., Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint, #8 Exhibit H to Complaint, #9 Exhibit I to Complaint, #10 Exhibit J to Complaint, #11 Exhibit K to Complaint, #12 Exhibit L to Complaint)(Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice L. Ta on behalf of CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement, Trade Secret Misappropriation, Tortious Interference, and Unfair Competition ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14009299), filed by MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation, CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew J. Gray, IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth M Gerber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Kraeutler