This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:52:34 (UTC).

Monolithic Power Systems Inc et al v. Baseus Accessories LLC

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Monolithic Power Systems Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Baseus Accessories LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah D. Morrison and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05756

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah D. Morrison

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC.,

CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

Monolithic Power Systems Inc

Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd

Defendant

BASEUS ACCESSORIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon Michael White

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

John Dudley Esterhay

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

John Peter Schnurer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

Defendant Attorney

Andrew J. Barber

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

301 Grant Street, One Oxford Center, 32Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 11:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Clerk's Entry of Default (Doc. #9 ) is set aside and Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/8/2022. (kk2) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Baseus Accessories LLC. (Barber, Andrew) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

14 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

14 #14

Main Document

13 #13

Main Document

11 #11

Main Document

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Baseus Accessories LLC (kk2) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to USPTO of Report on Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent by Plaintiffs Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd, Monolithic Power Systems Inc., (White, Brandon) Modified on 12/14/2021 to correct text and party names (kk2) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#3

Corporate Parent MPS International Ltd. added for Plaintiff Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd per #3 (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (kk2) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Monolithic Power Systems Inc (White, Brandon) Modified party name on 12/14/2021 (kk2) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

1 #4

Summons Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 11:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines per #18 : Baseus Accessories LLC answer due 2/11/2022 (kk2) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Clerk's Entry of Default (Doc. #9 ) is set aside and Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/8/2022. (kk2) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Baseus Accessories LLC. (Barber, Andrew) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION and Memorandum In Support to Set Aside Entry of Default and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint re #9 Clerk's Entry of Default, #1 Complaint, by Defendant Baseus Accessories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Barber, Andrew) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTATION ORDER granting #10 , #11 , #13 , #14 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John P Schnurer and John D Esterhay as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/2/2022. (kk2) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corrected MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8703301) of John D. Esterhay by Plaintiffs Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd, Monolithic Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (White, Brandon) Modified text on 2/2/2022 (kk2) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corrected MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8703259) of John P. Schnurer by Plaintiffs Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd, Monolithic Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (White, Brandon) Modified text on 2/2/2022 (kk2) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filings, docket #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John P. Schnurer & #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice D. Esterhay, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John P. Schnurer & #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John D. Esterhay as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/3/2022. (kk2) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8703301) of John D. Esterhay by Plaintiffs Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd, Monolithic Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (White, Brandon) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8703259) of John P. Schnurer by Plaintiffs Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd, Monolithic Power Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (White, Brandon) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **SET ASIDE PER ECF #18 ** - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Baseus Accessories LLC (kk2) Modified on 2/8/2022 (kk2) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application to Clerk for entry of default against Baseus Accessories LLC . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon M. White) (White, Brandon) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Baseus Accessories LLC. Baseus Accessories LLC served on 12/28/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (White, Brandon) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorporate Parent MPS International Ltd. added for Plaintiff Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd per #3 (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (kk2) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Baseus Accessories LLC (kk2) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to USPTO of Report on Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent by Plaintiffs Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd, Monolithic Power Systems Inc., (White, Brandon) Modified on 12/14/2021 to correct text and party names (kk2) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltdhite, Brandon) Modified party name on 12/14/2021 (kk2) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Monolithic Power Systems Inc (White, Brandon) Modified party name on 12/14/2021 (kk2) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Patent Infringement against Baseus Accessories LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8635357), filed by Monolithic Power Systems Inc, Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Form) (White, Brandon) Modified on 12/14/2021 to correct text and party names (kk2) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew J. Barber