This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2020 at 09:27:29 (UTC).

Monge et al v. Nevarez Law Firm et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Monge filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nevarez Law Firm. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephan M. Vidmar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01118

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe J Monge

El Paso, TX 79913

Defendants

Bank of New York Mellon

First American Title Guaranty Company

Rose L. Brand and Associates

Shawna Blount

New Mexico Mortgage Finance Authority

Little and Dranttel

Nevarez Law Firm

City of Sunland Park

Susan C. Little and Associates

Sierra Title

Los Ranchos Del Rio Property Owners Association, Inc.

Alicia Rojas

United General Title Insurance Co.

The Bank of New York

Bank of America Corporation

New Mexico Finance Authority

First American Financial Corporation

Francisco J Jayme

Carrington Mortgage

10 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #5 Plaintiffs' Motion to Request an Extension. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than February 5, 2021. Failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of this case. (rcf) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO REQUEST AN EXTENSION by Joe J Monge and Rosana E Monge. (cer) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint no later than December 4, 2020. (am) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

1 #1

envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rosana E Monge, Joe J Monge, Joseph J Monge. (ln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2020: #1 envelope) (ln). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #5 Plaintiffs' Motion to Request an Extension. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than February 5, 2021. Failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of this case. (rcf) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO REQUEST AN EXTENSION by Joe J Monge and Rosana E Monge. (cer) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint no later than December 4, 2020. (am) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB048172 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rosana E Monge, Joe J Monge, Joseph J Monge. (ln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2020: #1 envelope) (ln). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLU- is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Carrington Mortgage Services LLC is a litigant