This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2021 at 10:44:54 (UTC).

Monegro v. School Zone Publishing Company

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Monegro filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against School Zone Publishing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10052

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frankie Monegro

Defendant

School Zone Publishing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Mark Rozenberg

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

285 Passaic Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Thomas Bellifemine

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

One Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. School Zone Publishing Company served on 12/16/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. Document filed by Frankie Monegro..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 5, 2021. School Zone Publishing Company answer due 2/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/5/2021) (mro) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#10

(#10) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mark A. Beckman dated 1/4/2021. Document filed by School Zone Publishing Company. Return Date set for 2/5/2021 at 10:00 AM..(Bellifemine, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Bellifemine on behalf of School Zone Publishing Company..(Bellifemine, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of School Zone Publishing Company..(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#7

(#7) COMPLAINT against School Zone Publishing Company. Document filed by Frankie Monegro..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#6

(#6) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for March 8, 2021 by separate Order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/14/2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/3/2020) (mro) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/3/2020) (mro) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to School Zone Publishing Company..(pc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to School Zone Publishing Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by School Zone Publishing Company..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against School Zone Publishing Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22827659)Document filed by School Zone Publishing Company..(Rozenberg, Mark) Modified on 12/2/2020 (pc). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. School Zone Publishing Company served on 12/16/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. Document filed by Frankie Monegro..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 5, 2021. School Zone Publishing Company answer due 2/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/5/2021) (mro) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mark A. Beckman dated 1/4/2021. Document filed by School Zone Publishing Company. Return Date set for 2/5/2021 at 10:00 AM..(Bellifemine, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Bellifemine on behalf of School Zone Publishing Company..(Bellifemine, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of School Zone Publishing Company..(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against School Zone Publishing Company. Document filed by Frankie Monegro..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for March 8, 2021 by separate Order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/14/2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/3/2020) (mro) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/3/2020) (mro) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to School Zone Publishing Company..(pc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark Rozenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to School Zone Publishing Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by School Zone Publishing Company..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against School Zone Publishing Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22827659)Document filed by School Zone Publishing Company..(Rozenberg, Mark) Modified on 12/2/2020 (pc). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Beckman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Rozenberg