This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2023 at 08:20:26 (UTC).

Moncure v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Moncure filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LaKeysha Greer Isaac and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakandra M. Moncure

Defendant

Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Z. Wise

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline K. Ivanov

James J. Crongeyer, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5033639), filed by Lakandra M. Moncure. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (KNS) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Ivanov, Caroline) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Ivanov, Caroline) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Crongeyer, Jr on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Crongeyer, James) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Ivanov, Caroline) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#7

(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Ivanov, Caroline) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Crongeyer, Jr on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Crongeyer, James) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Ivanov, Caroline) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Ivanov, Caroline) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (KNS) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5033639), filed by Lakandra M. Moncure. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less