Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 07:35:07 (UTC).

Monarrez v. Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Monarrez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salvador Monarrez

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Incorporated

Equifax Information Services LLC

PHH Mortgage Corporation

Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Ali Chami

Attorney at Chami Law Firm PLLC

8245 N 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Defendant Attorneys

Emily Gildar Wagner

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Daniel Price Crane

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4406

Sean Keenan McElenney

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4406

Christi A Lawson

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP - Orlando, FL

111 N Orange Ave., Ste. 1800

Orlando, FL 32801

Myles Patrick Hassett

Attorney at Hassett Law Firm PLC

1221 E Osborn Rd., Ste. 102A

Phoenix, AZ 85014-5540

Jamie Alexander Glasser

Attorney at Hassett Law Firm PLC

1221 E Osborn Rd., Ste. 102A

Phoenix, AZ 85014-5540

David Robert Seidman

Attorney at Elardo Bragg Rossi & Palumbo PC

3001 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 130

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Wagner, Emily) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Crane, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated for Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated. (Glasser, Jamie) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated.(Glasser, Jamie) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 2/25/20 for defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 2/19/2020 for defendant Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time)(Seidman, David) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

5 #3

Summons

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17815669. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-0059-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Salvador Monarrez. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#18) NOTICE re: Voluntary Dismissal of Count III against Defendant Advantage Plus Reporting, Inc. by Salvador Monarrez re: #1 Complaint . (Chami, David) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Wagner, Emily) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christi A Lawson on behalf of Defendant Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Crane, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated for Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated. (Glasser, Jamie) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated.(Glasser, Jamie) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 2/25/20 for defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 2/19/2020 for defendant Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time)(Seidman, David) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE re: Voluntary Dismissal of Count III against Defendant Advantage Plus Reporting, Inc. by Salvador Monarrez re: #1 Complaint . (Chami, David) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting a one-time extension of time for 30 days for defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/4/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvador Monarrez: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil cover sheet, Notice to parties MIDPP & Notice of availability of Magistrate Judge upon Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation on 1/14/2020. (Chami, David) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvador Monarrez: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil cover sheet, Notice to parties MIDPP & Notice of availability of Magistrate Judge upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/14/2020. (Chami, David) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvador Monarrez: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil cover sheet, Notice to parties MIDPP & Notice of availability of Magistrate Judge upon Defendant Advantage Plus Reporting, Inc. on 1/15/2020. (Chami, David) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvador Monarrez: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil cover sheet, Notice to parties MIDPP & Notice of availability of Magistrate Judge upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 1/13/2020. (Chami, David) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/9/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Advantage Plus Reporting Incorporated, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17815669. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-0059-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Salvador Monarrez. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17815669 filed by Salvador Monarrez. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHH Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Chami