This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 09:51:34 (UTC).

Monarch Networking Solutions LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Monarch Networking Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cisco Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00381

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monarch Networking Solutions LLC

Defendants

Cisco Systems, Inc.

Meraki LLC

Duo Security, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven M. Shepard

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Th Fl.

New York, NY 10019

Catriona Lavery

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

S. Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

1127 Judson Rd., Suite 220

Longview, TX 75601

Alden G. Harris

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP

1111 Bagby St., Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth L. DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux, L.L.P.

114 E. Commerce Ave.

Gladewater, TX 75647

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Pkwy

Longview, TX 75604

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Robert Allan Bullwinkel

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP

1111 Bagby St., Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002-2912

T. John Ward, Jr.

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

P.O. Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Michael F. Heim

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush LLP

1111 Bagby St., Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph S. Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Max L. Tribble, Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Defendant Attorney

Michael E. Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 N College, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

9 #1

Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Duo Security, Inc., Meraki LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc. as to Duo Security, Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/24/2020, answer due 7/23/2020; Meraki LLC. Waiver sent on 5/24/2020, answer due 7/23/2020; Cisco Systems, Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/24/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc., Duo Security, Inc., Meraki LLC. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Cisco Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Duo Security, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Meraki LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph S. Grinstein filed for Catriona Lavery ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13589793) by on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F. Heim on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC (Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael F. Heim for Alden G. Harris ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13583175) by on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph S. Grinstein for Steven M. Shepard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13578145) by on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L. DeRieux on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC. Attorney Elizabeth L. DeRieux added to party Monarch Networking Solutions LLC(pty:pla) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S. Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC (Capshaw, S.) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Monarch Networking Solutions LLC. Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Monarch Networking Solutions LLC(pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Steven Shepard. (lad) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Alden G. Harris. (lad) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13570104). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Monarch Networking Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19)(mc5) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael E Jones