This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:26:57 (UTC).

Monaco Mechanical, Inc. v. Siemens Industry, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Monaco Mechanical, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Siemens Industry, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmond E. Chang and Sunil R. Harjani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02561

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Edmond E. Chang

Sunil R. Harjani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Monaco Mechanical, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Siemens Industry, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Patrick Connelly

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Brandon Allen Carnes

Attorney at Gozdecki, Del Giudice, Americus, Farkas & Brocato LLP

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60601

James Bryan Novy

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Nicholas L DeBruyne

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654-4614

Cory D Anderson

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Nicole O'toole

Attorney at Swanson Martin & Bell, Llp

330 N Wabash Ave, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

David Edward Kawala

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP

330 North Wabash, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Mark S Nazarof

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell

330 North Wabash, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

11 #2

Certificate of Service

11 #1

Exhibit

#11

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani:Preliminary settlement conference held by telephone. In-person settlement conference set for 7/10/19 stands. (lxs, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Monaco Mechanical, Inc.. (DeBruyne, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: In light of the scheduling of a settlement conference, Defendant's Motion for leave to file a third-party complaint #11 is denied without prejudice and may be re-filed by defendant if this matter does not settle after the settlement conference. Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing held. Settlement conference is set for 7/10/2019 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff's settlement letter is due by 6/17/2019. Defendant's settlement letter is due by 6/28/2019. Counsel cannot agree to amend the letter exchange deadlines amongst themselves. A preliminary settlement discussion with lead counsel is scheduled for 7/2/2019 at 10 a.m. by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone settlement call to Defendant's counsel and jointly contact chambers at (312) 435-3000. Parties are reminded that Magistrate Judge Harjani requires compliance with his Standing Order for Settlement Conference, which is available on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Discovery is stayed pending conclusion of settlement discussions. Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing set for 6/4/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in courtroom 1858. Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(V) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. for all further proceedings. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/23/2019. (ek, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. The parties have made substantial progress in settlement negotiations, and the parties filed the Joint Certification under the MID Standing Order [R.14]. The MID disclosures deadline is extended to 06/18/2019. Neither side believes that Western Surety needs to be in the case for settlement negotiations to hopefully resolve the case, so the motion #11 by Defendant to file Third-Party Complaint is entered and continued. In the joint status report, the parties report that they consent to proceed before the magistrate judge for all purposes, R. 18 at 3. The consent will be processed with the Executive Committee. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the status hearing time is reset to 8:45 a.m. on the same date, 05/22/2019. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion by Attorney Brandon A. Carnes to withdraw as attorney for Monaco Mechanical, Inc., #16 is granted. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc., Counter Claimant Siemens Industry, Inc.. (O'toole, Nicole) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Monaco Mechanical, Inc. by James Bryan Novy (Novy, James) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Monaco Mechanical, Inc. by Nicholas L DeBruyne (DeBruyne, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 05/22/2019 at 8:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ew, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ew, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. by Nicole O'toole (O'toole, Nicole) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. by David Edward Kawala (Kawala, David) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kawala, David) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2019L003177) filed by Siemens Industry, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15721845. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Kawala, David) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siemens Industry Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E. Kawala