This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2022 at 07:27:02 (UTC).

Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County et al v. Burns et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Burns. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillip J. Green. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County

Jennifer Wortz

Stacy Wohlheter

Defendants

Rebecca Burns

Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency

Reading Community Schools

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daren A. Wiseley

Attorney at Wiseley Law PLLC

41 1/2 E Bacon St.

Hillsdale, MI 49242

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra Lee Page

Attorney at Rosati Schultz Joppich & Amtsbuechler, PC (Lansing)

822 Centennial Way, Ste. 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Thomas David Beindit

Attorney at Rosati, Schultz, Joppich & Amtsbuechler, P.C.

822 Centennial Way., Ste. 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Andrew James Brege

Attorney at Rosati Schultz Joppich & Amtsbuechler, PC (Lansing)

822 Centennial Way, Ste. 270

Lansing, MI 48917

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco Mullins & Horton PC

101 W Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Fl.

Troy, MI 48084-5280

Travis Mark Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco Mullins & Horton PC

101 W Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Fl.

Troy, MI 48084-5280

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER regarding settlement conference: early settlement conference set for 1/24/2022 at 01:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; Defendants' deadline to file a reply is extended to 2/7/2022; this matter is STAYED pending the completion of the Early Settlement Conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#17

(#17) MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of omnibus hearing via Zoom; Order to issue regarding settlement conference (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#8

(#9) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #8 with Proof of Service filed by Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sept 3 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sept 22 Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Wohlheter Letters, #4 Exhibit 4 - Denial of TRO) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

7 #7

Exhibit 6

7 #5

Exhibit 4

7 #4

Exhibit 3

7 #3

Exhibit 2

7 #2

Exhibit 1

#7

(#11) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss #7 filed by Reading Community Schools (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns re Notice (Other), #3 (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

3 #3

Exhibit C - Ex 1 - State Summons & Complaint

3 #2

Exhibit B - Corrected Proof of Service

3 #1

Exhibit A - Corrected Notice of Removal

#3

(#13) SUPPLEMENT re Notice (Other), #3 of Removal by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Affidavits, #2 Attachment 2 - Order Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Attachment 3 - Register of Actions) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#2

(#2) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns re Notice of Removal, #1 (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint

#1

(#3) NOTICE re #1 Ex Parte Request to Accept Amended Pleadings in Place of the Original Notice of Removal and Associated Records Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(A) by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Ex 1 - State Summons & Complaint) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER regarding settlement conference: early settlement conference set for 1/24/2022 at 01:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; Defendants' deadline to file a reply is extended to 2/7/2022; this matter is STAYED pending the completion of the Early Settlement Conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of omnibus hearing via Zoom; Order to issue regarding settlement conference (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss #7 , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #8 RESPONSE filed by Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County, Stacy Wohlheter, Jennifer Wortz (Wiseley, Daren) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF REFERENCE pursuant to consent of parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge ; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jep) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUPPLEMENT re Notice (Other), #3 of Removal by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Affidavits, #2 Attachment 2 - Order Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Attachment 3 - Register of Actions) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/17/2021 at 11:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 12/14/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss #7 filed by Reading Community Schools (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXHIBIT re #8 Index of Unpublished Authority by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - City of Streetsboro v Fraternal Ord. of Police, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fratarcangeli v Myers, #3 Exhibit 3 - Hartwell v Houghton Lake Cmty. Sch, #4 Exhibit 4 - Jones-Bey v Michigan Dept of Corr, #5 Exhibit 5 - Martinko v Whitmer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pleasant View Baptist Church v Beshear, #7 Exhibit 7 - Ready for the World v Riley, #8 Exhibit 8 - Roath v Lee, #9 Exhibit 9 - Roberts v Beshear, #10 Exhibit 10 - S. Wind Women's Ctr v Stitt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Thompson v Whitmer, #12 Exhibit 12 - Martinko v Whitmer, #13 Exhibit 13 - Resurrection Sch. v Hertel) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #8 with Proof of Service filed by Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sept 3 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sept 22 Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Wohlheter Letters, #4 Exhibit 4 - Denial of TRO) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas David Beindit on behalf of defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Beindit, Thomas) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alexandra Lee Page on behalf of defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Page, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (eod) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Travis Mark Comstock on behalf of defendant Reading Community Schools (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of defendant Reading Community Schools (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns re Notice (Other), #3 (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE re #1 Ex Parte Request to Accept Amended Pleadings in Place of the Original Notice of Removal and Associated Records Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(A) by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Ex 1 - State Summons & Complaint) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns re Notice of Removal, #1 (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6592951 (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsdale County Circuit Court case number 21-706-CZ filed by Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet) (Brege, Andrew) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis M. Comstock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy J Mullins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas David Beindit