Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 16:13:09 (UTC).

Molinaro v. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Molinaro filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Joel Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07251

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ron Molinaro

Defendants

HUAHAI U.S. INC.

SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC

PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC.

PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC. doing business as SOLCO HEALTHCARE LLC

In Re

VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis I. Mussman

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC NJ BAR

18501 Pines Blvd Ste 209-A

Pembroke Pines, FL 33029-1420

John R. Davis

Attorney at Slack Davis Sanger, LLP

2705 Bee Cave Road, Suite 200

Austin, TX 78746

ALLAN KANNER

Attorney at ALLAN KANNER & ASSOCIATES, PC

701 Camp Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

RUBEN HONIK

Attorney at GOLOMB & HONIK, P.C.

1835 Market Street, Suite 2900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DAVID J. STANOCH

Attorney at GOLOMB & HONIK, P.C.

1515 Market Street, Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Brian T. Ku

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC NJ BAR

18501 Pines Blvd Ste 209-A

Pembroke Pines, FL 33029-1420

MICHAEL L. SLACK

Attorney at NOT A MEMBER OF USDC NJ BAR

2705 Bee Cave Road, Suite 200

Austin, TX 78746

Layne Hilton

Attorney at Kanner & Whiteley, LLC

701 Camp Street

New Orleans, LA 70115

Conlee S. Whiteley

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC NJ-BAR

701 Camp St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

LAYNE CLARK HILTON

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

701 Camp Street

New Orleans, LA 70115

JOHN RANDOLPH DAVIS

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

2705 Bee Cave Road, Suite 220

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorney

Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC NJ

201 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) MDL Case Management Order No. 1. The Court will hold the Initial Conference in Courtroom 4D on 3/27/2019 at 2:00 PM, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/25/2019(dd, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#32

(#32) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

31 #1

*Restricted*

#31

(#31) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00710. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#30

(#30) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of New Jersey Transferee court case number: 2:18-cv-710-FtM-99UAM MDL case number: 2875 (RMT) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

29 #3

Exhibit 3

29 #2

Exhibit 2

29 #1

Exhibit 1

#29

(#29) STATUS report (Joint Status Report Advising of Ruling on the Motion to Transfer Actions to the District of New Jersey Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings) by Huahai US Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gurland, Harvey) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Huahai US Inc. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/26/2018. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Ron Molinaro. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without prejudice to filing an Amended Complaint on or before November 7, 2018. Failure to do so will result in the Court closing this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/30/2018. (LMF) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MDL Case Management Order No. 1. The Court will hold the Initial Conference in Courtroom 4D on 3/27/2019 at 2:00 PM, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/25/2019(dd, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCase transferred on 2/28/19 MDL 2875 (Middle District of Florida 2:18-716) (dd, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00710. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of New Jersey Transferee court case number: 2:18-cv-710-FtM-99UAM MDL case number: 2875 (RMT) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) STATUS report (Joint Status Report Advising of Ruling on the Motion to Transfer Actions to the District of New Jersey Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings) by Huahai US Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gurland, Harvey) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting #27 the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Stay and Defer All Deadlines Pending a Ruling on the Motion to Transfer Actions to the District of New Jersey for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. This case shall remain stayed pending the ruling on the underlying Motion to Transfer. The parties shall file a status report within seven (7) days of the JPML's ruling on the Motion to Transfer, apprising the Court of the JPML's decision. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/14/2019. (LMF) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Joint MOTION to stay (Further Stipulation and Joint Motion to Stay Case and Defer all Deadlines Pending a Ruling on the Motion to Transfer Actions to the District of New Jersey Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings) by All Defendants. (Gurland, Harvey) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • (#26) Case Reassigned to Unassigned Magistrate Judge. New case number: 2:18-cv-710-FtM-99UAM. Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando no longer assigned to the case. (laf) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/5/2018. (WRW) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Ron Molinaro.(Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Ron Molinaro. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without prejudice to filing an Amended Complaint on or before November 7, 2018. Failure to do so will result in the Court closing this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/30/2018. (LMF) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ron Molinaro. Related case(s): Yes (Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS issued as to Huahai US Inc. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued as to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/26/2018. (RMT) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. New case number: 2:18-cv-710-FtM-99CM. (NAS) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14756494) filed by Ron Molinaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. doing business as SOLCO HEALTHCARE US, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HUAHAI U.S. INC. is a litigant