This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 07:39:24 (UTC).

MOLEWSKI et al v. AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO. et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 MOLEWSKI filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-04119

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL MOLEWSKI

DIANE MOLEWSKI

Defendants and Cross Claimants

BOWTECH, INC.

AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO.

EXTREME TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

BASS PRO SHOPS, INC.

BASS PRO GROUP, LLC

BASS PRO INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, LLC

BASS PRO OUTDOOR WORLD, LLC

BASS PRO, LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO.

BASS PRO GROUP, LLC

BASS PRO INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, LLC

BASS PRO OUTDOOR WORLD, LLC

BASS PRO, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH M. KANFER

Attorney at WOOLFORD KANFER LAW, P.C.

101 N Pointe Blvd Suite 200

Lancaster, PA 17022

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI

Attorney at PISCIOTTI MALSCH BUCKLEY

30 Columbia Turnpike

Florham Park, NJ 07932

DANNY CHARLES LALLIS

Attorney at PISCIOTTI MALSCH PC

30 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 205

Florham Park, NJ 07932

CLIFFORD MARK LANEY

Attorney at PISCIOTTI MALSCH PC

30 Columbia Turnpike Suite 205

Florham Park, NJ 07932

JESSICA REILLY

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

Suite 2620, 2001 Market St, Two Commerce Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

JESSICA REILLY

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

Suite 2620, 2001 Market St, Two Commerce Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Case Management Track Form

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 11/13/20 THAT BASS PRO DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER BOWTECH'S CROSS-CLAIMIN THIS ACTION BE EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 23, 2020. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 10/13/20. 10/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by DANNY CHARLES LALLIS on behalf of BOWTECH, INC. with Certificate of Service(LALLIS, DANNY) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD MARK LANEY on behalf of BOWTECH, INC. (LANEY, CLIFFORD) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BOWTECH, INC..(PISCIOTTI, ANTHONY) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Bowtech, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO., BASS PRO GROUP, LLC, BASS PRO INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, LLC, BASS PRO OUTDOOR WORLD, LLC, BASS PRO, LLC by BOWTECH, INC..(PISCIOTTI, ANTHONY) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF 10/1/20 THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY, ECF NO. 5 IS GRANTED. THE PARTIES ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. DEFENDANTS' RESPONE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DUE NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 23, 2020. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 10/1/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Limited Discovery filed by AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO., BASS PRO GROUP, LLC, BASS PRO INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, LLC, BASS PRO OUTDOOR WORLD, LLC, BASS PRO, LLC.Certificate of Service.(REILLY, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA REILLY on behalf of AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO., BASS PRO GROUP, LLC, BASS PRO INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, LLC, BASS PRO OUTDOOR WORLD, LLC, BASS PRO, LLC with Certificate of Service(REILLY, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. PISCIOTTI on behalf of BOWTECH, INC. (PISCIOTTI, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 08/24/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to AMERICAN SPORTSMAN HOLDINGS CO., BASS PRO GROUP, LLC, BASS PRO INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, LLC, BASS PRO OUTDOOR WORLD, LLC, BASS PRO, LLC, BOWTECH, INC.. Forwarded To: Joseph M. Kanfer on 8/24/20 (fdc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by DIANE MOLEWSKI, MICHAEL MOLEWSKI. (lisad, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14512753.), filed by MICHAEL MOLEWSKI, DIANE MOLEWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(KANFER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Extreme Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bowtech, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bass Pro, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bass Pro Outdoor World LLC is a litigant