This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2022 at 09:20:39 (UTC).

Molecular Rebar Design, LLC et al v. LG Chem, Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Molecular Rebar Design, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LG Chem, Ltd ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory B. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01130

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory B. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Molecular Rebar Design, LLC

Black Diamond Structures, LLC

Defendants

LG Electronics, Inc.

LG Chem, Ltd.

LG Energy Solution, Ltd.

LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,475,961 B2 ;US 9,636,649 B2 ;US 10,608,282 B2. (vfm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Molecular Rebar Design, LLC for Black Diamond Structures, LLC, filed by Black Diamond Structures, LLC, Molecular Rebar Design, LLC. (vfm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#5

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. on 8/29/2022. (vfm) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wasif H. Qureshi, Leisa Talbert Peschel, and Blake T. Dietrich - filed by Black Diamond Structures, LLC, Molecular Rebar Design, LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#8

(#8) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wasif H. Qureshi, Leisa Talbert Peschel, and Blake T. Dietrich filed by Black Diamond Structures, LLC, Molecular Rebar Design, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/1/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Docket(#7) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 9/1/2022. (etg) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wasif H. Qureshi, Leisa Talbert Peschel, and Blake T. Dietrich - filed by Black Diamond Structures, LLC, Molecular Rebar Design, LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. on 8/29/2022. (vfm) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Molecular Rebar Design, LLC for Black Diamond Structures, LLC, filed by Black Diamond Structures, LLC, Molecular Rebar Design, LLC. (vfm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,475,961 B2 ;US 9,636,649 B2 ;US 10,608,282 B2. (vfm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against LG Chem, Ltd.,, LG Electronics, Inc., LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.,, LG Energy Solution, Ltd., ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3946925.) - filed by Molecular Rebar Design, LLC, Black Diamond Structures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet). (vfm) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less