This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2019 at 07:05:08 (UTC).

Molden v. Joseph et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Molden filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Joseph. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy D. DeGiusti and Stephen P. Friot. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Timothy D. DeGiusti

Stephen P. Friot

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nathaniel Molden, Jr

Defendants

Country Inn and Suites by Radisson Inc

Immanuel Properties LLC

Country Inn and Suites by Carlson Inc

Jain Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles T Battle

Attorney at Battle Law Firm PLLC

1415 Nw 43Rd St

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan D Buxton

Attorney at Edinger Leonard & Blakley PLLC

6301 N Western Ave, Suite 250

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Jason A Reese

Attorney at Edinger Leonard & Blakley PLLC

6301 N Western Ave, Suite 250

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

David R Herber

Attorney at Edinger Leonard & Blakley PLLC

6301 N Western Ave, Suite 250

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Ryan T Leonard

Attorney at Edinger Leonard & Blakley PLLC

6301 N Western Ave, Suite 250

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Summons Issued Electronically as to Country Inn and Suites by Carlson Inc, Country Inn and Suites by Radisson Inc. (ank) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#9

(#9) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 4/19/2019. (llg) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Charles T Battle on behalf of Nathaniel Molden, Jr (Battle, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Immanuel Properties LLC . (Reese, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#6

(#6) Receipt for Money Received from Jain Joseph in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500072345 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (ac) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Immanuel Properties LLC, Jain Joseph.(Reese, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A Reese on behalf of Immanuel Properties LLC, Jain Joseph (Reese, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/7/2019. (mb) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/7/2019. (mb) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-5818 filed by Jain Joseph, Immanuel Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued Electronically as to Country Inn and Suites by Carlson Inc, Country Inn and Suites by Radisson Inc. (ank) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 4/19/2019. (llg) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Charles T Battle on behalf of Nathaniel Molden, Jr (Battle, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Immanuel Properties LLC . (Reese, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Receipt for Money Received from Jain Joseph in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500072345 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (ac) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Immanuel Properties LLC, Jain Joseph.(Reese, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A Reese on behalf of Immanuel Properties LLC, Jain Joseph (Reese, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/7/2019. (mb) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/7/2019. (mb) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-5818 filed by Jain Joseph, Immanuel Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.