This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 11:16:20 (UTC).

Mokszycki v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Mokszycki filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:23-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monte Mokszycki

Defendants

TBF Financial LLC

Equifax Information Services LLC

TransUnion LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tamir Saland

Nayeem N. Mohammed

Defendant Attorneys

John Tucker Easter

Alan B Padfield

Brandon James Gibbons

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC filed by Monte Mokszycki (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

11 #1

Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by TBF Financial LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement)Attorney John Tucker Easter added to party TBF Financial LLC(pty:dft) (Easter, John) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TransUnion, LLC ; served on 3/2/2023. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of settlement as to Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC filed by Monte Mokszycki (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TBF Financial LLC ; served on 2/28/2023. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Waiver sent on 2/27/2023. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nayeem N. Mohammed on behalf of Monte Mokszycki. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mohammed, Nayeem) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC, TBF Financial LLC, TransUnion, LLC. (sre) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#2

(#2) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13543870) filed by Monte Mokszycki (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #6

Proposed Summons for PHX

1 #5

Proposed Summons for TBF

1 #4

Proposed Summons for Transunion

1 #3

Proposed Summons for Equifax

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certificate of Interested Parties

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Equifax Information Services LLC, Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC, TBF Financial LLC, TransUnion, LLC filed by Monte Mokszycki. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13543817) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Equifax, #4 Proposed Summons for Transunion, #5 Proposed Summons for TBF, #6 Proposed Summons for PHX) (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC filed by Monte Mokszycki (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by TBF Financial LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement)Attorney John Tucker Easter added to party TBF Financial LLC(pty:dft) (Easter, John) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TransUnion, LLC ; served on 3/2/2023. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of settlement as to Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC filed by Monte Mokszycki (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TBF Financial LLC ; served on 2/28/2023. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Waiver sent on 2/27/2023. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nayeem N. Mohammed on behalf of Monte Mokszycki. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mohammed, Nayeem) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC, TBF Financial LLC, TransUnion, LLC. (sre) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Monte Mokszycki. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF) (See doc #1 for document). (sre) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13543870) filed by Monte Mokszycki (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Equifax Information Services LLC, Phoenix Management Solutions, LLC, TBF Financial LLC, TransUnion, LLC filed by Monte Mokszycki. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13543817) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Equifax, #4 Proposed Summons for Transunion, #5 Proposed Summons for TBF, #6 Proposed Summons for PHX) (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less