This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 07:53:22 (UTC).

Mokhtarian v. Fasci et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Mokhtarian filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Fasci. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gina L Simms and Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01542

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gina L Simms

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheyda Mokhtarian

Defendants

Daniel Fasci

U.S. Dept. of the Navy

United States Department of the Navy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cary Johnson Hansel, III

Attorney at Hansel Law, P.C.

2514 North Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21218

 

Court Documents

3 #3

Summons

#5

(#5) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

3 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sheyda Mokhtarian (Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. United States Department of the Navy served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019.(Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 60 days as to Daniel Fasci, United States Department of the Navy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

1 #2

Summons Fasci Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons US Navy Summons

3 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8031776.), filed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Fasci Summons, #3 Summons US Navy Summons)(Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. Daniel Fasci served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019.(Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/3/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. Daniel Fasci served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019.(Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. United States Department of the Navy served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019.(Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/3/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Sheyda Mokhtarian or counsel for Sheyda Mokhtarian are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/7/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 60 days as to Daniel Fasci, United States Department of the Navy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sheyda Mokhtarian (Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8031776.), filed by Sheyda Mokhtarian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Fasci Summons, #3 Summons US Navy Summons)(Hansel, Cary) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.