This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2021 at 13:15:19 (UTC).

Beverly Moistner et al v. Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Beverly Moistner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03138

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Todd Moistner

Beverly Moistner

Defendants

The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc.

Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc.

The Boeing Company

Boeing North America, Inc.

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neal Alison Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Partners

1720 Carlyle Avenue

Santa Monica, CA 90402

Anthony G Graham

Attorney at Graham and Martin LLP

2901 West Coast Highway Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92663

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Samuel Goldstein

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Tammy Ann Tsoumas

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David A. Klein

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin T. Van Wart

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Moistner, Todd Moistner. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Neal) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS: ORDER STRIKING by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court strikes the MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Moistner, Todd Moistner #28 , without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the Court's standing order (provided that the refiling is otherwise timely), see Dkt. No. #29 . Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 6/3/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 30] First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Moistner, Todd Moistner. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attorney Neal Alison Roberts added to party Beverly Moistner(pty:pla), Attorney Neal Alison Roberts added to party Todd Moistner(pty:pla)) (Roberts, Neal) Modified on 6/4/2021 (gk). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 9/10/2021 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) report #25 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order. Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 9/23/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 9/10/2021. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 1/28/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 6/24/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/22/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 8/5/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 8/12/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 8/9/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 8/26/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 9/9/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT ; estimated length of trial 10-15 days, filed by Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company.. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTES OF VTC Scheduling Conference held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court directed the parties to file a supplemental report either providing a discovery plan in support of the parties' proposed dates in the Rule 26(f) report or providing a new, condensed proposed schedule. The parties should file the supplemental report by 5/21/2021. If the parties require additional time to meet and confer on the report, they should advise the Court and the Court will consider a request to continue that deadline. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (gk) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND AND RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #21 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court hereby GRANTS the Parties' Stipulation and sets the following schedule: 1. Plaintiffs shall file a motion to remand no later than May 28, 2021. 2. Defendants shall file an opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to remand no later than June 18, 2021. 3. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief in support of Plaintiffs' motion to remand no later than July 2, 2021. 4. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than 21 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion to remand. In the event Plaintiffs do not file a motion to remand by May 28, 2021, Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by June 18, 2021. (lom) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court reschedules the hearing time of the Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2021 from 8:30 AM to 08:45 AM to be conducted remotely via Zoom webinar before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The Clerk shall provide the parties with the Zoom link. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., Does 1-100, The Boeing Company., filed by Plaintiffs Beverly Moistner, Todd Moistner. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/8/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc., re Notice of Appearance, #8 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Declaration, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Appearance, #7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Notice of Appearance #6 served on April 12, 2021. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan Samuel Goldstein on behalf of Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc. (Attorney Jonathan Samuel Goldstein added to party Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Samuel Goldstein added to party The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David A. Klein on behalf of Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc. (Attorney David A. Klein added to party Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Klein added to party The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Klein, David) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas on behalf of Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc., (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc.. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Tammy A. Tsoumas re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Ventura, case number 56-2021-00551733-CU-PO-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-31097218 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc., Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to The Boeing Company, #3 Exhibit C - Summons to Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint to The Boeing Company, #5 Exhibit E - Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint to Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc., #6 Exhibit F - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Notice of Assignment) (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party Aerojet Rocketdyne Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party The Boeing Company aka Boeing North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boeing North America Ninc is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID ALAN KLEIN(Designation Retained)