This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:23:24 (UTC).

Mohsinuddin et al v. SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Mohsinuddin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00527

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheikh Mohsinuddin

Syeda Mohsinuddin

Defendant

SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shaun Wesley Hodge

Attorney at Hodge Law Firm, PLLC

Suite 302

Galveston, TX 77550

Defendant Attorneys

David Chumbley

Attorney at Law Office of David Chumbley

400 Chisholm Place, Suite 101

Plano, TX 75075

Jonathan Cline Wyatt

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, LLP - Dallas

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana.(Wyatt, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana, filed by Sheikh Mohsinuddin, Syeda Mohsinuddin.(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/12/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana.(baf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana, filed by Sheikh Mohsinuddin, Syeda Mohsinuddin.(baf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana identifying Corporate Parent General Insurance Company of America for SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana. (Chumbley, David) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #8

Supplement Supplement Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit Certificate of Interested Parties

1 #6

Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, Original Answer

1 #5

Exhibit Citation

1 #4

Exhibit Civil Case Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Plaintiffs' Original Petition

1 #2

Exhibit Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Index of Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana from 14th District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-21-02866. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8486839), filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Civil Case Sheet, #5 Exhibit Citation, #6 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, Original Answer, #7 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Parties, #8 Supplement Supplement Cover Sheet)(Chumbley, David) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana.(Wyatt, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana, filed by Sheikh Mohsinuddin, Syeda Mohsinuddin.(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/12/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana.(baf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana, filed by Sheikh Mohsinuddin, Syeda Mohsinuddin.(baf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana identifying Corporate Parent General Insurance Company of America for SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana. (Chumbley, David) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana from 14th District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-21-02866. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8486839), filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Civil Case Sheet, #5 Exhibit Citation, #6 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, Original Answer, #7 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Parties, #8 Supplement Supplement Cover Sheet)(Chumbley, David) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L Chumbley