This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2022 at 10:01:01 (UTC).

Mohsen Parsa v. Instagram, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 Mohsen Parsa filed an Other lawsuit against Instagram, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohsen Parsa

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendants

Instagram, LLC

Twitter, Inc.

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mohsen Parsa

Attorney at Mohsen Parsa Inc

2030 Main Street Suite 1300

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob Marcus Heath

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1015

Michelle Nicole Molner

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jonathan A Patchen

Attorney at Willkie Farr and Gallagher LLP

One Front Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa(Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#24

(#24) Notice Amended Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa. (Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#23

(#23) ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DATE by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Parties have stipulated, subject to this Courts approval, that Plaintiff shall have until December 15, 2022, to file an amended complaint and that Defendants Twitter, Inc., Instagram, LLC, and Meta Platforms, Inc., shall have until January 13, 2023, to file a response to the operative complaint. Pursuant to Parties' stipulation, and good cause so appearing: IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michelle Nicole Molner on behalf of Defendants Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attorney Michelle Nicole Molner added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Nicole Molner added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft))(Molner, Michelle) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order on Stipulation Re Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response

#21

(#21) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation Re Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Date)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#20

(#20) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jacob Marcus Heath on behalf of Defendants Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attorney Jacob Marcus Heath added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Marcus Heath added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft))(Heath, Jacob) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#18

(#18) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, #9 filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa. (Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. Pro Se litigants cannot use their access as an attorney to file a matter as a pro se litigant. Pro Se litigants must seek approval from the court to e-file. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. Summons should be e-filed separately, the correct event is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints and select Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:22-cv-01993-JWH-ADSx. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#21) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation Re Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Date)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa(Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice Amended Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa. (Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DATE by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Parties have stipulated, subject to this Courts approval, that Plaintiff shall have until December 15, 2022, to file an amended complaint and that Defendants Twitter, Inc., Instagram, LLC, and Meta Platforms, Inc., shall have until January 13, 2023, to file a response to the operative complaint. Pursuant to Parties' stipulation, and good cause so appearing: IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michelle Nicole Molner on behalf of Defendants Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attorney Michelle Nicole Molner added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Nicole Molner added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft))(Molner, Michelle) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation Re Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Date)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jacob Marcus Heath on behalf of Defendants Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attorney Jacob Marcus Heath added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Marcus Heath added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft))(Heath, Jacob) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, #9 filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa. (Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Docket(#17) ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order for Setting Hearing for Preliminary Injunction (the Application) [ECF No. 9]. The Court hereby DIRECTS Defendants to file their respective responses to the Application no later than 12:00 noon on Monday, November 7, 2022. The matter shall be deemed under submission after briefing is complete. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO THE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER opposition re: First APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER FOR SETTING HEARING FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RESTRAINING DEFENDANTS FROM ALLOWING THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRANS GOVERNMENT, ITS STATE SPONSOR #9 filed by Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Attorney Jonathan A Patchen added to party Twitter, Inc.(pty:dft))(Patchen, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Bruce Anderson filed by Plaintiff Mohsen Parsa. (Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [WITHDRAWN AS OF 11-3-22] First APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER FOR SETTING HEARING FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RESTRAINING DEFENDANTS FROM ALLOWING THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRANS GOVERNMENT, ITS STATE SPONSORED MEDIA OUTLETS, AND VARIOUS ISLAMIC REPUBLIC GOVERNMENT OFFICIALS FROM DISSEMINATING DISINFORMATION ON DEFENDANTS SOCIAL MEDIA INTERNET PLATFORMS filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa. Application set for hearing on 11/4/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mohsen Parsa in Support of TRO, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Parsa, Mohsen) Modified on 11/3/2022 (yl). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Mohsen Parsa filed by plaintiff Mohsen Parsa. (Attorney Mohsen Parsa added to party Mohsen Parsa(pty:pla)) (Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. Pro Se litigants cannot use their access as an attorney to file a matter as a pro se litigant. Pro Se litigants must seek approval from the court to e-file. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. Summons should be e-filed separately, the correct event is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints and select Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:22-cv-01993-JWH-ADSx. (car) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34239559 - Fee: $402, filed by Pro se Mohsen Parsa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Attorney Mohsen Parsa added to party Mohsen Parsa(pty:bkmov))(Parsa, Mohsen) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Instagram, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TWITTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Alan Patchen