This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/19/2019 at 07:45:56 (UTC).

Mohnsen v. Educational Service Unit No. 1 et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Mohnsen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Educational Service Unit No 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03061

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kerri Mohnsen

Defendants

Educational Service Unit No. 1

Edward Stansberry

Stuart Clark

William Heimann

Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen M. Neary

Attorney at POWERS LAW FIRM

411 South 13Th Street, Suite 300

Lincoln, NE 68508

Defendant Attorneys

Randall L. Goyette

Attorney at BAYLOR, EVNEN LAW FIRM

1248 O Street, Suite 600, Wells Fargo Center

Lincoln, NE 68508

Christopher M. Schmidt

Attorney at BAYLOR, EVNEN LAW FIRM

1248 O Street, Suite 600, Wells Fargo Center

Lincoln, NE 68508

Jeanelle R. Lust

Attorney at KNUDSEN, BERKHEIMER LAW FIRM

3800 Vermaas Place, Suite 200

Lincoln, NE 68502

Charles E. Wilbrand

Attorney at KNUDSEN, BERKHEIMER LAW FIRM

3800 Vermaas Place, Suite 200

Lincoln, NE 68502

 

Court Documents

#21

#19

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2019
  • (#22) TEXT ORDER The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is now set for September 3, 2019. On or before August 23, 2019, a party shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to set a conference call if: 1. One or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report; or 2. The parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report; or 3. The parties are currently and actively pursuing settlement and believe preparing and filing a Rule 26(f) Report may be unnecessary. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW) (Entered: 08/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint regarding: Order on Motion to Amend, 20 by Edward Stansberry, Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) (Wilbrand, Charles) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) TEXT ORDER granting #19 The parties' Joint Stipulation to Amend Answer. Defendants Walthill Public Schools and Edward Stansberry shall file their Amended Answer on or before August 16, 2019. The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set in Filing No. #17 is continued until further order of this court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.(CEW) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JOINT MOTION to Amend Answer by Attorney Charles E. Wilbrand on behalf of Defendants Edward Stansberry, Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013).(Wilbrand, Charles) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to Amended Complaint #3 by Stuart Clark, Educational Service Unit No. 1, William Heimann (Goyette, Randall) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Educational Service Unit No. 1 on 6/24/2019. (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Stuart Clark on 6/24/2019. (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) on 6/21/2019. (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Amended Complaint #3 by Edward Stansberry, Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) (Wilbrand, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to defendants Stuart Clark, Educational Service Unit No. 1, William Heimann, Edward Stansberry, and Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013). YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Requested as to Edward Stansberry regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Requested as to William Heimann regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Requested as to Stuart Clark regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Requested as to Walthill Public Schools (Nebraska School District No. 87-0013) regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Requested as to Educational Service Unit No. 1 regarding Amended Complaint #3 . (Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Kerri Mohnsen(Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3963397), by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Kerri Mohnsen(Neary, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Educational Service Unit No. 16 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Edward Wilbrand

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall L. Goyette

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeanelle R. Lust