This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2021 at 07:20:06 (UTC).

Mohammad Khalid Jawed v. Tracy Renaud

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Mohammad Khalid Jawed filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Tracy Renaud. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04055

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammad Khalid Jawed

Defendant

Tracy Renaud

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bernard P. Wolfsdorf

Attorney at Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP

1416 2Nd Street

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Bernard P Wolfsdorf

Attorney at Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP

1416 2Nd Street

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorney

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable (lc) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mohammad Khalid Jawed, upon Defendant Tracy Renaud served on 5/21/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to N/A. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to N/A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to N/A. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable (lc) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to United States Attorney's Office (car) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General. (car) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tracy Renaud. (car) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mohammad Khalid Jawed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Attorney General, #2 Proposed Summons - USAO)(Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mohammad Khalid Jawed, identifying N/A. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mohammad Khalid Jawed. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31296179 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mohammad Khalid Jawed. (Attorney Bernard P. Wolfsdorf added to party Mohammad Khalid Jawed(pty:pla))(Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less