This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2021 at 07:14:19 (UTC).

Mohamed v. Sanistevens et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Mohamed filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Sanistevens. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina M Rodriguez and Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02676

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Regina M Rodriguez

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Khalfan Khamis Mohamed

Florence, CO 81226

Defendants

Sanistevens

(I) Sanistevens

Medrano

(I) Medrano

Concay

(I) Conay

True

(I) True

(I) Concay

Saroski

(I) Saroski

USA

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khalfan Khamis Mohamed. Concay waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; Medrano waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; Sanistevens waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; Saroski waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; True waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#9

(#9) Acknowledgment of Service on behalf of United States Attorney's Office for the District of Colorado (angar, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

8 #1

USPS

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02676. (sphil, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b), the court has determined that this case does not appear appropriate for summary dismissal. This case shall be drawn to District Judge R. Brooke Jackson and to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02676-RBJ. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 7, 2021. (rvill, ) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Granting #3 and #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to: FLM-LegalSvcs-S@bop.gov. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/05/2021. (athom, ) (emailed as ordered) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Khalfan Khamis Mohamed. (mbrow, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#3

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khalfan Khamis Mohamed. Concay waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; Medrano waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; Sanistevens waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; Saroski waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022; True waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Acknowledgment of Service on behalf of United States Attorney's Office for the District of Colorado (angar, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Prisoner Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (sphil, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02676. (sphil, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b), the court has determined that this case does not appear appropriate for summary dismissal. This case shall be drawn to District Judge R. Brooke Jackson and to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02676-RBJ. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 7, 2021. (rvill, ) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Granting #3 and #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to: FLM-LegalSvcs-S@bop.gov. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/05/2021. (athom, ) (emailed as ordered) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Khalfan Khamis Mohamed. (mbrow, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Khalfan Khamis Mohamed. (mbrow, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (mbrow, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against Concay, Concay (I), Medrano, Medrano (I), Saistevens (I), Sanistevens, True, True (I), filed by Khalfan Khamis Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(mbrow, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medrano is a litigant

Latest cases where True is a litigant