This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 09:24:29 (UTC).

Mohamed v. Babkkir et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Mohamed filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Babkkir. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Colville. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00522

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Colville

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lokman Mohamed

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

ESSAM E. BABKKIR

Edirgawi Transport, Inc.

Olga Schilk

DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC.

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Olga Schilk

DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEEDA R. MUSITIEF

Attorney at The Musitief Firm, LLC

1333 Race Street

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph F. Butcher

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz P.L.L.C.

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000, The Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

John W. Zotter

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000, The Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

JOSEPH FREDERICK BUTCHER

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz PLLC

Grant Bldg, 310 Grant St

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Kristen Hock Prex

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote, P.C.

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-5402

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC., Olga Schilk. (Prex, Kristen) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

22 #1

Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

(#20) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/15/22. (cjo) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/7/22. (Schwab, Arthur) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (Schwab, Arthur) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Zotter on behalf of ESSAM E. BABKKIR, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. (Zotter, John) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

15 #15

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Lokman Mohamed. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 4/4/2022 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL TO CHAMBERS AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(ahf) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#5

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Lokman Mohamed. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

4 #2

Trial Procedures

4 #1

Conf. Info Sheet

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#23) THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC., Olga Schilk. (Prex, Kristen) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service Via U.S. Mail and US Mail by Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15715797), filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • Docket(#24) Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 21-cv-348, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 21-cv-348. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/26/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC., Olga Schilk. (Prex, Kristen) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ESSAM E. BABKKIR, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Butcher, Joseph) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/15/22. (cjo) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Colville for all further proceedings. Judge Arthur J. Schwab no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/11/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/7/22. (Schwab, Arthur) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (Schwab, Arthur) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Zotter on behalf of ESSAM E. BABKKIR, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. (Zotter, John) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00516. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC. waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. Olga Schilk waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Lokman Mohamed. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 4/4/2022 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL TO CHAMBERS AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(ahf) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Transfer filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer and Certificate of Service.(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketThird-Party Summons Issued as to DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC.and OLGA SCHILK. Emailed to counsel on 2/11/22. (mbh, ) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/24/2022 AT 11:30 AM IN BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Conf. Info Sheet, #2 Trial Procedures)(ahf) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Olga Schilk, DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC. by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service Via U.S. Mail and US Mail by Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15715797), filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIEBOLD NIXDORF INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Hock Prex