This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 07:13:17 (UTC).

Mohamed v. Babkkir et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Mohamed filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Babkkir. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00516

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL M. BAYLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lokman Mohamed

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Essam E Babkkir

Edirgawi Transport, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendants

Olga Schilk

DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEEDA R. MUSITIEF

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH FREDERICK BUTCHER

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15715797), filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service Via U.S. Mail and US Mail by Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Olga Schilk, DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC. by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Conf. Info Sheet

4 #2

Trial Procedures

#5

(#5) MOTION to Transfer filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer and Certificate of Service.(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 4/4/2022 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL TO CHAMBERS AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(ahf) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Lokman Mohamed. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. Olga Schilk waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC. waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Lokman Mohamed. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#12

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/4/22. 4/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE IT FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/4/22. 4/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania via CM/ECF electronic transfer. (mbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE IT FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/4/22. 4/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/4/22. 4/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 4/4/22. (JL) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Lokman Mohamed. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC. waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc.. Olga Schilk waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Lokman Mohamed. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 4/4/2022 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL TO CHAMBERS AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(ahf) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Transfer filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer and Certificate of Service.(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketThird-Party Summons Issued as to DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC.and OLGA SCHILK. Emailed to counsel on 2/11/22. (mbh, ) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/24/2022 AT 11:30 AM IN BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Conf. Info Sheet, #2 Trial Procedures)(ahf) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Olga Schilk, DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC. by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service Via U.S. Mail and US Mail by Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15715797), filed by Essam E Babkkir, Edirgawi Transport, Inc..(BUTCHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less