This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 09:29:20 (UTC).

Moeller et al v. The Aliera Companies et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Moeller filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Aliera Companies. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam E Haddon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam E Haddon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maria Moeller

Ron Moeller

Defendants

Does 1-10

Chase Moses

Shelley Steele

The Aliera Companies

Trinity Healthshare

Timothy Moses

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M. Morrison

Attorney at MORRISON, SHERWOOD, WILSON & DEOLA, PLLP

401 N Last Chance Gulchpo Box 557

Helena, MT 59624

Anne E. Sherwood

Attorney at MORRISON, SHERWOOD, WILSON & DEOLA, PLLP

401 N Last Chance Gulchpo Box 557

Helena, MT 59624

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah R. Craig

201 North Franklin Street, Suite 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Stefan T. Wall

Attorney at WALL, McLEAN & GALLAGHER, PLLC

1 N Last Chance Gulch, Suite 4Po Box 1713

Helena, MT 59624

Elizabeth B. Shirley

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN

420 North 20Th Streetsuite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Sarah R Craig

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

201 North Franklin St.Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Nathan A. Schacht

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER - DENVER

1801 California Streetsuite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Jacqueline T. Menk

Attorney at BAKER HOSTETLER - Georgia

1170 Peachtree Street, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jeffrey R. Baxter

Attorney at BAKER HOSTETLER - Georgia

1170 Peachtree Street, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30309

Nathan D. Bilyeu

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 N Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601-4298

Sean D. Slanger

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 N Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601-4298

 

Court Documents

230 #6

Proposed Order

230 #5

Exhibit 5

230 #3

Exhibit 3

230 #1

Exhibit 1

229 #4

Exhibit 4

229 #3

Exhibit 3

229 #2

Exhibit 2

229 #1

Exhibit 1

229 #229

Main Document

#8

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

491 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#236) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Sam E Haddon: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2022 re #229 , #230 Present in the courtroom are John Morrison for Plaintiffs; StefanWall for Defendants The Aliera Companies and Defendant Shelley Steel and Chase Moses; Nathan Schacht for Trinity Healthshare; Nathan Bilyeu for Timothy Moses. Pro Hac Vice counsel Elizabeth Shirley and Sara Craig are not present. Nathan Schacht heard on behalf of Trinity Healthshares; Stefan Wall for Aliera Companies, Dft Shelly Steel and Chase Moses; John Morrison for Plaintiffs. Court: Motion to Withdraw is taken under advisement and a ruling will be made as promptly as feasible limited to the motion for the law firm to withdraw as counsel. This case remains STAYED. Nothing further from the parties. Court is in Recess. Hearing commenced at 10:00 and concluded at 10:52. (Court Reporter John LaPierre.) (Law Clerk: C. Whyte), (Hearing held in Helena) (HEG) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#235) ORDERED: Local counsel for Defendant Trinity Healthshare, Nathan A. Shacht, is expected to be present at the January 6, 2022, hearing. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/3/2022. (HEG) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#234) NOTICE by Trinity Healthshare Request for Clarification regarding the Court's December 16, 2021 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Schacht, Nathan) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#233) NOTICE by Maria Moeller, Ron Moeller NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY OF THE ALIERA COMPANIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A) (Morrison, John) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#232) ORDER of USCA as to #220 Notice of Appeal, filed by The Aliera Companies. Appellees motion (Docket Entry No. 17) to dismiss for failure to prosecute is denied as moot. (HEG) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) ORDERED: A hearing on Defendant's Counsel's Second Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel shall be held at 10:00 a.m. on January 6, 2022, at the Paul G. Hatfield Federal Courthouse, 901 Front Street, Helena, Montana. Contract Court Reporter is Needed. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/16/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#230) Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Amended, Unopposed Elizabeth B. Shirley appearing for Defendant The Aliera Companies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order) (Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#229) Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth B. Shirley appearing for Defendant The Aliera Companies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#228) ORDERED: Except as outlined by this order the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is DENIED. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/26/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth B. Shirley appearing for Defendant The Aliera Companies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan T. Wall on behalf of The Aliera Companies (Wall, Stefan) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Trinity Healthshare shall have to and including May 6, 2020, to file an answer or other appropriate responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/13/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint Nathan A. Schacht appearing for Defendant Trinity Healthshare (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Schacht, Nathan) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint served on The Aliera Companies, Inc on 3/26/2020, filed by Maria Moeller, Ron Moeller. (Morrison, John) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint served on Trinity HealthShare, Inc on 3/26/2020, filed by Maria Moeller, Ron Moeller. (Morrison, John) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ron Moeller, Maria Moeller. (Morrison, John) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDERED: This case will be dismissed on March 31, 2020, unless Plaintiff files an amended complaint properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/24/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Trinity Healthshare, The Aliera Companies, Timothy Moses, Shelley Steele, Chase Moses. Original Summonses mailed to counsel for service. (HEG) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400., receipt number 0977-2459899 (HEG) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ron Moeller, Maria Moeller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) Modified on 3/23/2020 to correct file date (HEG). (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aliera Companies, Inc., The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan D. Bilyeu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan A. Schacht

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline T. Menk