This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:55:53 (UTC).

Moe v. Geico Indemnity Co. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Moe filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and Jeremiah C. Lynch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

Jeremiah C. Lynch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon L. Moe

Defendants

Geico Indemnity Co.

John Does I - XX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark J. Luebeck

Attorney at ANGEL COIL BARTLETT

125 West Mendenhall, Suite 201

Bozeman, MT 59715

Daniel Patrick Buckley

Attorney at BUCKLEY LAW OFFICE

125 West Mendenhall

Bozeman, MT 59715

Defendant Attorneys

Ian McIntosh

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

William M. Morris

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

Sheila Carmody

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP - PHOENIX

One Arizona Center, 400 E. Van Buren, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Rachael P. Pugel

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP - PHOENIX

One Arizona Center, 400 E. Van Buren, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Replies due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/8/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Response to Motion Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit Order Fuchs v. Wyss et al

#16

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brandon L. Moe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Fuchs v. Wyss et al) (Buckley, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/18/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff Brandon L. Moe Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Geico Indemnity Co. Notice of Filing Attorney Sheila Carmody's Acknowledgement & Acceptance of Terms of Admission Pro Hac Vice (Carmody, Sheila) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Geico Indemnity Co. re #11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Rachel Peters Pugel for Defendant Geico. Signed by Magistrate Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/4/2019. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sheila Carmody for Geico Indemnity Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/4/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION Rachael Pugel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2317572.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

8 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION Sheila Carmody to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2317571.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Replies due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/8/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Response to Motion Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brandon L. Moe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Fuchs v. Wyss et al) (Buckley, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/18/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Daniel Patrick Buckley appearing for Plaintiff Brandon L. Moe Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Geico Indemnity Co. Notice of Filing Attorney Sheila Carmody's Acknowledgement & Acceptance of Terms of Admission Pro Hac Vice (Carmody, Sheila) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Geico Indemnity Co. re #11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Rachel Peters Pugel for Defendant Geico. Signed by Magistrate Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/4/2019. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sheila Carmody for Geico Indemnity Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/4/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION Rachael Pugel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2317572.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION Sheila Carmody to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2317571.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Geico Indemnity Co.. (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendant Geico Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Ian McIntosh, William M. Morris, Daniel Patrick Buckley, Mark J. Luebeck. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/17/2019. (APP) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/16/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/16/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/16/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/29/2019. (TXB) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of state court file. (Attachments: #1 Doc 2, #2 Doc 3) (ASG) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT filed by Brandon L. Moe in state court on December 21, 2018. (ASG) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Filing fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2311454. (NOS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-18-1324B, filed by Geico Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Antonacci, #2 Exhibit B - State court pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less