This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2020 at 10:41:00 (UTC).

Moe et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Moe filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Becky R. Thorson and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01514

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gregory Moe

Debra Moe

Defendants

American Medical Systems, Inc

Ethicon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yvonne M Flaherty

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Thomas Philip Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Daryl J. Douglas

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Jan R McLean Bernier

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

250 Marquette Avenue South, Ste 800

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Tracy J Van Steenburgh

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

250 Marquette Avenue South, Suite 800

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Brandie L Morgenroth

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

120 S 6Th St Ste 400

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#87

#86

#84

#82

81 #1

Consent Form

#81

#80

50 #1

Exhibit A - B

#50

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

261 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Debra Moe, Gregory Moe . (Douglas, Daryl) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #50 Motion. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy) Modified text/link on 8/31/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/11/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Jointly Signed by Debra Moe, Gregory Moe, Ethcon, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson.(Van Steenburgh, Tracy) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#83) (Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference is reset for 8/11/2020 at 08:00 AM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendants Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morgenroth, Brandie) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 7/23/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #77 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daryl J. Douglas for Debra Moe and for Gregory Moe; granting #78 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas Philip Cartmell for Debra Moe and for Gregory Moe. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/13/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas P. Cartmell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7870073 filed by Debra Moe, Gregory Moe. (Flaherty, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Debra Moe. (Schnieders, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 06/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Debra Moe. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Debra Moe, Gregory Moe against American Medical Systems, Inc. ("AMS"), Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) (Modified on 4/24/2014 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 89 (AMENDED Order Scheduling Future Status Conferences & Other Matters) entered on 10/23/2013 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2732171. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandie L Morgenroth