This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2020 at 07:38:57 (UTC).

Modica v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Modica filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14464

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Modica

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reagan Levert Toledano

Attorney at Willeford & Toledano

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 4208

New Orleans, LA 70170

James Frederick Willeford

Attorney at Willeford & Toledano

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 4208

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8018585) filed by Deborah Modica. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Deborah Modica(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8018585) filed by Deborah Modica. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Deborah Modica(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.