This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 07:44:38 (UTC).

Modern Remodeling, Inc. v. Tripod Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Modern Remodeling, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tripod Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01397

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Modern Remodeling, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Strong Wall Construction, LLC

Patrick Ryan Boyle

High Mark Construction, LLC

Randy Moran

David Drab

Rachel Franks

MGB Investments, LLC

Robert Gately Keenan

Tripod Holdings, LLC

Matthew Olesky

Robert Michael Kimball

Earl Edwards

Robert Gately Keenan, III

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Wendy Hartmann Moore

Attorney at McGuire Moore

323 West Camden St. Ste. 410

Baltimore, MD 21201

Charles Joseph Kresslein

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

2800 Quarry Lake Dr Ste 200

Baltimore, MD 21209

Donald Eugene English, Jr

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

2800 Quarry Lake Drive, Suite 200

Baltimore, MD 21209

Melissa Menkel McGuire

Attorney at McGuire Moore, LLC

323 West Camden Street, Suite 410

Baltimore, MD 21201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Mark D Maneche

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law PA

901 Dulaney Valley Rd Ste 500

Towson, MD 21204

Steven A Allen

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law PA

901 Dulaney Valley Rd Ste 500

Towson, MD 21204

Tyler J Nowicki

Attorney at John W Nowicki PA

727 N Hickory Ave

Bel Air, MD 21014

John W Nowicki

Attorney at John W Nowicki PA

727 N Hickory Ave

Bel Air, MD 21014

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) Stipulated ORDER Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#45

(#45) ORDER granting #43 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Respond to Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#44

(#44) STIPULATION Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material by Modern Remodeling, Inc.(Kresslein, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

43 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#43

(#43) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Counterclaims by Modern Remodeling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kresslein, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#42

(#42) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#41

(#41) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Modern Remodeling, Inc. by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Randy Moran, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/25/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#39

RESTRICTED

2 #7

Text of Proposed Order

2 #6

Exhibit 5

2 #5

Exhibit 4

2 #4

Exhibit 3

2 #3

Exhibit 2

2 #2

Exhibit 1

#2

(#38) [FILED IN ERROR] REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#37) [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Stipulated ORDER Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER granting #43 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Respond to Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) STIPULATION Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material by Modern Remodeling, Inc.(Kresslein, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Counterclaims by Modern Remodeling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kresslein, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Modern Remodeling, Inc. by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Randy Moran, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/25/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) QC NOTICE: #37 Answer to Complaint filed by Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Rachel Franks, Earl Edwards, Matthew Olesky, #38 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Rachel Franks, Earl Edwards, Matthew Olesky, #39 Counterclaim filed by Rachel Franks was filed incorrectly. **This filing continues to be repeatedly filed incorrectly, using various events, even after previous assistance from the Clerk's Office. Please contact the Clerk's Office for assistance BEFORE attempting to refile this document again, as we were unable to reach counsel by telephone. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) [FILED IN ERROR] COUNTERCLAIM against Modern Remodeling, Inc., filed by Rachel Franks.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) [FILED IN ERROR] REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John W Nowicki on behalf of Robert Gately Keenan, III (Nowicki, John) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John W Nowicki on behalf of Earl Edwards (Nowicki, John) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued 21 days as to Patrick Ryan Boyle, David Drab, Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, High Mark Construction, LLC, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Robert Michael Kimball, MGB Investments, LLC, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky, Strong Wall Construction, LLC, Tripod Holdings, LLC.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER confirming the results of the telephone conference call held on 5/15/19; denying as moot #3 Emergency Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/15/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Modern Remodeling, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Summons) (English, Donald) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Modern Remodeling, Inc. was filed incorrectly. Summons not filed. Please file summons using the Notice entry and attach the summons to that entry. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing, Expedited Briefing Schedule, and Expedited Discovery by Modern Remodeling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Donald) (Entered: 05/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Modern Remodeling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Donald) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8007130.), filed by Modern Remodeling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(English, Donald) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Eugene English, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Joseph Kresslein