This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/06/2021 at 14:14:16 (UTC).

In re: In the Matter of Modern American Railroad Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 In re In the Matter of Modern American Railroad Services, LLC was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Jay C. Zainey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00464

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Modern American Railroad Services, LLC

Shore Offshore Services, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Montrell Smith

Lewis Andrews

Fieldwood Energy Offshore LLC

REC Marine Logistics, LLC

Weeks Marine, Inc.

Dawn Services, LLC

Premier Offshore Catering, Inc.

Fieldwood Energy LLC

Crosby Tugs, L.L.C.

Complete Logistical Services, LLC

Greater Lafourche Port Commission

REC Boats, LLC

Lesle Williams

Harvey Gulf International Marine, LLC

Patrick Burnett

Brian Cloyd

Wallace McCray

Martin Energy Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Gavin H. Guillot

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2250, New Orleans, Suite 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Aaron Benjamin Greenbaum

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Meredith W. Blanque

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jacob A Altmyer

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC

1100 Poydras St., Ste. 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Taylor Mark Bacques

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Salvador Joseph Pusateri

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

1 #7

LOU

1 #8

LOU

1 #6

LOU

#5

4 #1

Notice to Claimants

#4

#3

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Notice to Claimants

1 #9

Proposed Order

1 #5

Ad Interim Stip

1 #4

Verification

1 #3

Verification

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: The above matter is hereby consolidated with 2:21-cv-00258-JCZ-KWR and 2:21-cv-337-JCZ-KWR. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/9/2021.(ajn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER APPROVING PETITIONER'S LETTERS OF UNDERTAKING, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(ajn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/8/2021.(mm) (NEF: MJ 4&5, DJ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMITATION OF LIABILTY against Shore Offshore Services, LLC, Modern American Railroad Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8764091) filed by Shore Offshore Services, LLC, Modern American Railroad Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Value, #2 Declaration of Pending Freight, #3 Verification of Cody Sims, #4 Verification of Dwight Caton, #5 Ad Interim Stip, #6 Primary LOU, #7 Excess LOU, #8 Umbrella LOU, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Notice to Claimants, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Gavin H. Guillot added to party Modern American Railroad Services, LLC(pty:pet), Attorney Gavin H. Guillot added to party Shore Offshore Services, LLC(pty:pet).(Guillot, Gavin) Modified text on 3/5/2021 (lt). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REC Boats, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Harvey Gulf International Marine, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dawn Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PREMIER OFFSHORE CATERING INC is a litigant