Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 09:16:37 (UTC).

Modena v. U.S. Bank National Association et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Modena filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against U S Bank National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00974

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J. Modena

Grand Rapids, MI 49548

Defendants

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

U.S. Bank National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Dawn Nicole Williams

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC (Grand Rapids)

300 Ottawa Ave Nw, Suite 700

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Laura C. Baucus

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC (Bloomfield Hills)

39577 Woodward Ave., Ste. 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPLY to response to motion #13 to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION to strike #13 by plaintiff Michael J. Modena; (ns) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#16

(#16) LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: First Request for Production of Documents returned to Michael J. Modena (clw) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #13 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to dismiss by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association; (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Michael J. Modena for request for production of documents (clw) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#12

(#12) REPLY to response to motion #10 with certificate of service filed by Michael J. Modena (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

10 #1

Attachment 1

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #6 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#8) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #6 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael J. Modena 109 Barry Street, SE, #3 Grand Rapids MI 49548 (clw) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Michael J. Modena and Clerk of Oceana County Circuit Court by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#8) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #6 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY to response to motion #13 to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to strike #13 by plaintiff Michael J. Modena; (ns) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: First Request for Production of Documents returned to Michael J. Modena (clw) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #13 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to dismiss by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association; (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Michael J. Modena for request for production of documents (clw) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to response to motion #10 with certificate of service filed by Michael J. Modena (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to remand case back to state Court #10 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to remand case back to state Court by plaintiff Michael J. Modena; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael J. Modena (clw) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #6 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #6 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association; (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael J. Modena 109 Barry Street, SE, #3 Grand Rapids MI 49548 (clw) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Michael J. Modena and Clerk of Oceana County Circuit Court by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4621879 (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oceana County Circuit Court case number 19-13845-CZ filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Williams, Dawn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Baucus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dawn Nicole Williams