Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2019 at 08:04:28 (UTC).

MODE Transportation, LLC v. Golden Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 MODE Transportation, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Golden Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Munley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01045

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Munley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MODE Transportation, LLC

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

Golden Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory M Mallon, Jr.

Attorney at Zarwin, Baum, DeVito, Kaplan, Schaer & Toddy, P.C.

1818 Market St, 13Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David M. Poell

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton, LLP

70 W. Madison Street, 48Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Paul A. Werner

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Paul A Werner

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton, LLP

Suite 100, 2099 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-6801

David M Poell

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton, LLP

70 W. Madison Street, 48Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Brendan G Lamanna

Attorney at Zarwin Baum DeVito Kaplan Schaer Toddy, PC

1818 Market Street, 13Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly D. Borland

Attorney at Borland & Borland

69 Public Square, 11Th Floor

Wilkes-Barre, PA 18701

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#15

(#15) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Golden Technologies by MODE Transportation, LLC.(Lamanna, Brendan) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by David M Poell on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC (Poell, David) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/30/19. (sm) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/30/19. (sm) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan G Lamanna on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC. (Lamanna, Brendan) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer, Additional Defenses and Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Technologies, Inc. by Golden Technologies, Inc..(Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#9

(#9) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brendan Lamanna, Paul Werner, and David PoellSigned by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/11/19. (sm) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#7

(#7) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney Paul Werner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811236.. (Mallon, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#6

(#6) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney Brendan G. Lamanna is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811142.. (Mallon, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Golden Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Golden Brothers, Inc. for Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint filed by MODE Transportation, LLC of Affiant Brian Duffy. (Mallon, Gregory) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Borland on behalf of Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Golden Technologies, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cw) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Golden Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4792752), filed by MODE Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(cw) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Golden Technologies by MODE Transportation, LLC.(Lamanna, Brendan) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by David M Poell on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC (Poell, David) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/30/19. (sm) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/30/19. (sm) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan G Lamanna on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC. (Lamanna, Brendan) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer, Additional Defenses and Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Technologies, Inc. by Golden Technologies, Inc..(Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brendan Lamanna, Paul Werner, and David PoellSigned by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/11/19. (sm) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney David Poell is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811265.. (Mallon, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney Paul Werner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811236.. (Mallon, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney Brendan G. Lamanna is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811142.. (Mallon, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Golden Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Golden Brothers, Inc. for Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint filed by MODE Transportation, LLC of Affiant Brian Duffy. (Mallon, Gregory) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Borland on behalf of Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Golden Technologies, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cw) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Golden Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4792752), filed by MODE Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(cw) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MODE TRANSPORATION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREGORY M. MALLON, JR.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan G. Lamanna Esq.