This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 08:06:40 (UTC).

Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service v. Betts Sr.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Mock, Inc d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Betts Sr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02058

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Ronnie Betts Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Steven Wilson Fulgham

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKEWITZ, PC

165 Madison Ave., Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Angie C. Davis

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

First Tennessee Bank Building, 165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

William B. Ryan

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

Bryce William Ashby

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) ORDER granting DE #33 Motion signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#33

(#33) MOTION - Joint Motion to Suspend Deadlines and Scheduled Hearings - proposed order submitted by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Settlement /Joint Notice of Settlement by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#31

(#31) ORDER denying DE #25 Motion to Amend/Correct signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#30

(#30) ORDER granting DE #27 Motion for Protective Order signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/19/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#27

(#27) Joint MOTION for Protective Order - Proposed Consent Protective Order Submitted by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

25 #2

Exhibit B - Medix Staffing Case

25 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration or Mr. Betts

#25

(#25) MOTION to Amend/Correct #24 Order on Motion for TRO Emergency Hearing Requested by Ronnie Betts Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration or Mr. Betts, #2 Exhibit B - Medix Staffing Case)(Ryan, William) (Entered: 02/10/2019)

1 #10

Summons - Please Issue for Private Process Service

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Photo

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Hearing Excerpts

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Business Card

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Email

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - SOS Summary

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Training

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ronnie Betts Sr. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2972116), filed by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Training, #3 Exhibit 3 - SOS Summary, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Business Card, #6 Exhibit 6 - Hearing Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 7 - Photo, #8 Exhibit 8 - Photo, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - Please Issue for Private Process Service)(Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting DE #33 Motion signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION - Joint Motion to Suspend Deadlines and Scheduled Hearings - proposed order submitted by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Settlement /Joint Notice of Settlement by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER denying DE #25 Motion to Amend/Correct signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER granting DE #27 Motion for Protective Order signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/19/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Blair, Allen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service by Ronnie Betts Sr..(Ryan, William) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Joint MOTION for Protective Order - Proposed Consent Protective Order Submitted by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Amend/Correct #24 Order on Motion for TRO Emergency Hearing Requested /Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Order Submitted filed by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration)(Davis, Angie) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION to Amend/Correct #24 Order on Motion for TRO Emergency Hearing Requested by Ronnie Betts Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration or Mr. Betts, #2 Exhibit B - Medix Staffing Case)(Ryan, William) (Entered: 02/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service as to Ronnie Betts Sr.. (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Wilson Fulgham on behalf of Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service (Fulgham, Steven) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#7) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Ronnie Betts Sr.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Proposed Order Submitted by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ronnie Betts Sr. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2972116), filed by Mock, Inc. d/b/a Hi-Speed Industrial Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Training, #3 Exhibit 3 - SOS Summary, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Business Card, #6 Exhibit 6 - Hearing Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 7 - Photo, #8 Exhibit 8 - Photo, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - Please Issue for Private Process Service)(Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.