This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:28:41 (UTC).

Mobile Motherboard Inc. v. Quantum Creations LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Mobile Motherboard Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Quantum Creations LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Chris M. McAliley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-21642

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Chris M. McAliley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mobile Motherboard Inc.

Defendants

Quantum Creations LLC doing business as Quantum Suppliers

Quantum Prospects LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David R. Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60614-0184

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA

4940 Munson Street Nw, Aegis Tower - Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mobile Motherboard Inc.. All Defendants. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

16 #1

Summon(s)

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendant Quantum Prospects LLC by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendant Quantum Creations LLC by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David R. Bennett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (rr00) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#11

(#11) Corrected Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mobile Motherboard Inc. identifying Other Affiliate David R Bennett, Other Affiliate Direction IP Law, Other Affiliate Howard L Wernow, Other Affiliate Sand, Sebolt and Wernow Co., LPA, Other Affiliate Paul Juhasz for Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Declaration

10 #10

Main Document

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Quantum Creations LLC, Quantum Prospects LLC. (swr) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#7

(#7) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David R. Bennett, mailing date May 27, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

6 #1

Complaint

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mobile Motherboard Inc.. All Defendants. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Quantum Creations LLC, Quantum Prospects LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendant Quantum Prospects LLC by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendant Quantum Creations LLC by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David R. Bennett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (rr00) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corrected Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mobile Motherboard Inc. identifying Other Affiliate David R Bennett, Other Affiliate Direction IP Law, Other Affiliate Howard L Wernow, Other Affiliate Sand, Sebolt and Wernow Co., LPA, Other Affiliate Paul Juhasz for Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David R. Bennett. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15673073 by Mobile Motherboard Inc.. Responses due by 6/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ebz) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Quantum Creations LLC, Quantum Prospects LLC. (swr) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David R. Bennett, mailing date May 27, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (swr) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Mobile Motherboard Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Improperly Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information correctly for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (swr) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Quantum Creations LLC dba Quantum Suppliers, Quantum Prospects LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15672105, filed by Mobile Motherboard Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE48365, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Bennett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow