This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 08:52:18 (UTC).

Moasis Global Corporation v. Simplifi Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Moasis Global Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Simplifi Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00892

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moasis Global Corporation

Defendant

Simplifi Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Michael Shumaker

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Steven Chase Callahan

Attorney at Charhon Callahan Robson & Garza PLLC

3333 Lee Parkway, Suite 460

Dallas, TX 75219

Cabrach John Connor

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Christopher T Bovenkamp

Attorney at Charhon, Callahan, Robson, Garza PLLC

3333 Lee Parkway, Suite 460

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy A Fielding

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1601 Elm Street

Dallas, TX 75201

David Dyer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

401 Congress Ave

Austin, TX 78701

Dee J Kelly, Jr

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102-3194

Gianni Cutri

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Lars L Berg

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102-3194

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #7

Exhibit(s) 7

14 #6

Exhibit(s) 6

14 #5

Exhibit(s) 5

14 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

14 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

14 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

14 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 12/22/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/5/2022. Motions due by 6/6/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/6/2022. Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2022. This case is set for trial on this Court's four week docket beginning October 3, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/23/2021) (mmw) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint STATUS REPORT Case Management filed by Moasis Global Corporation. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Appendix in Support filed by Simplifi Holdings, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Request For More Definite Statement and Brief in Support (Fielding, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simplifi Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Campaign Parent LLC for Simplifi Holdings, Inc.. (Fielding, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Request For More Definite Statement and Brief in Support filed by Simplifi Holdings, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7) (Fielding, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lars L Berg on behalf of Simplifi Holdings, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Berg, Lars) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dee J Kelly, Jr on behalf of Simplifi Holdings, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kelly, Dee) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Before the Court is the Unopposed Amended Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (ECF No. #10 ), filed August 19, 2021. Defendant states that the parties agreed to a September 30, 2021 deadline to respond due to the complicated nature of the complaint. The Motion is GRANTED in part. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is September 10, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/20/2021) (pef) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First Amended Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Simplifi Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fielding, Jeremy) Modified document title on 8/20/2021 (pef). (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER...The Joint Report, which shall be filed on or before September 15, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/19/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #7 ...Before the Court is the Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (ECF No. 7), filed August 18, 2021. Defendant does not state good cause for its request, but merely states that the parties agreed to a September 30, 2021 deadline to respond. The Motion is DENIED. No extensions will be granted without good cause. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/19/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Simplifi Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeremy A Fielding added to party Simplifi Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Fielding, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Simplifi Holdings, Inc. (sre) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (sre) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Moasis Global Corporation. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Moasis Global Corporation. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Simplifi Holdings, Inc. filed by Moasis Global Corporation. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12087001) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet) (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dee J Kelly, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lars L Berg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gianni Cutri

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy A Fielding