This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2020 at 07:38:51 (UTC).

Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund et al v. Mech et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Mech. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03113

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of the Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund

Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund

Defendants

Sarah Centineo

Bellevue, NE 68005

Estate of Miles Mech

Megan Mech

Ryan Mech

Centineo Law, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond R. Aranza

Attorney at WALENTINE, O'TOOLE LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 540125

Omaha, NE 68154-0125

Garrett W. Hunkins

Attorney at ROUSE, FRETS LAW FIRM

4510 Belleview Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorney

Sarah F. Centineo

Attorney at CENTINEO LAW FIRM

1709 Childs Road East

Bellevue, NE 68005

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

#4

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#14

#15

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement (filing #10 ) is granted. On or before February 10, 2020, the plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint clarifying the matters set forth above. The Clerk of the Court shall set an amended complaint deadline for February 10, 2020. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY BRIEF in opposition to MOTION For a More Definite Statement #10 by Attorney Garrett W. Hunkins on behalf of Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund, Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund.(Hunkins, Garrett) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule: The plaintiffs shall respond to the defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement #10 on or before January 27, 2020. The defendants may reply in support of their motion on or before February 3, 2020. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER withdrawing #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. At the defendants' request, the motion is withdrawn. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Sarah F. Centineo on behalf of Defendants Sarah Centineo, Centineo Law, P.C., Estate of Miles Mech, Ryan Mech, Megan Mech.(Centineo, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION For a More Definite Statement by Attorney Sarah F. Centineo on behalf of Defendants Sarah Centineo, Centineo Law, P.C., Estate of Miles Mech, Ryan Mech, Megan Mech.(Centineo, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction (filing #2 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE by Attorney Sarah F. Centineo on behalf of Defendants Sarah Centineo, Centineo Law, P.C., Estate of Miles Mech, Ryan Mech, Megan Mech.(Centineo, Sarah) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Sarah F. Centineo on behalf of Defendants Sarah Centineo, Centineo Law, P.C., Estate of Miles Mech, Ryan Mech, Megan Mech (Centineo, Sarah) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: With the consent and agreement of the parties, the TRO hearing scheduled for December 10, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. is cancelled.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion. A hearing on Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #2 will be held tomorrow, December 10, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEF in support of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Preliminary Injunction #2 by Attorney Garrett W. Hunkins on behalf of Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund and Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund (Hunkins, Garrett) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Garrett W. Hunkins on behalf of Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund and Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund.(Hunkins, Garrett) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4071951), by Attorney Garrett W. Hunkins on behalf of Mo-Kan Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hunkins, Garrett) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond Ralph Aranza