This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 07:58:36 (UTC).

MLI RX LLC et al v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 MLI RX LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00429

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KELLEY BRISBON HODGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MLI RX LLC

AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP.

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.

H.D. SMITH, LLC

VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC

CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.

CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC.

THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C.

CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC

MCKESSON CORPORATION

BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC.

DAKOTA DRUG, INC.

NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY

J M SMITH CORPORATION doing business as SMITH DRUG COMPANY

VALUE DRUG COMPANY

PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC.

Defendants

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC formerly known as SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE

SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID F. SORENSEN

BRUCE E. GERSTEIN

DAN LITVIN

KRISTYN FIELDS

PETER R. KOHN

CAITLIN G. COSLETT

Defendant Attorneys

Brianna Alunni

ROBIN P. SUMNER

Brinna Ludwig

DANIEL J. BOLAND

MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL

KARL GUNDERSON

DEVORA W. ALLON

GILAD BENDHEIM

JAY P. LEFKOWITZ

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) Response re #54 Notice (Other),, / Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#56

(#56) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY BRUCE E. GERSTEIN AND DAN LITVIN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/24/2023. 3/24/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#55

(#55) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR KRISTYN FIELDS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/23/2023.3/24/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#54

(#54) NOTICE by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #28 MOTION to Transfer , #30 MOTION to Stay Case PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

30 #2

Text of Proposed Order

30 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

28 #2

Declaration of Gilad Bendheim and Exhibit A

28 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

#28

(#53) REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Transfer filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including H.D. Smith, LLC, H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by H.D. SMITH, LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Services Corp. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MLI RX LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16476801.), filed by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., MLI RX LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, DAKOTA DRUG, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., H.D. SMITH, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#57) Response re #54 Notice (Other),, / Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#56) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY BRUCE E. GERSTEIN AND DAN LITVIN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/24/2023. 3/24/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#55) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR KRISTYN FIELDS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/23/2023.3/24/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#54) NOTICE by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #28 MOTION to Transfer , #30 MOTION to Stay Case PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#53) REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Transfer filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#52) REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Stay Case filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (O'DONNELL, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#51) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Kristyn Fields ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16575208.) filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(KOHN, PETER) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#50) NOTICE of Appearance by JAY P. LEFKOWITZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(LEFKOWITZ, JAY) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#49) NOTICE of Appearance by GILAD BENDHEIM on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(BENDHEIM, GILAD) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#48) NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA W. ALLON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(ALLON, DEVORA) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cardinal Health, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cardinal Health, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including H.D. Smith, LLC, H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by H.D. SMITH, LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Services Corp. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MLI RX LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16476801.), filed by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., MLI RX LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, DAKOTA DRUG, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., H.D. SMITH, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SORENSEN, DAVID) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less