This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 09:51:59 (UTC).

M.K. et al v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 M K filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09506

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.K

M.K.

O.K.

Defendants

STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL J. KOWAL

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN AMY JENSEN

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #4

Certificate of Service

9 #3

Text of Proposed Order

9 #2

Certification of Counsel

9 #1

Brief

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Consent Order for Extension of Time

#6

#5

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice to State Court of Removal

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/25/2019. (byl) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Responses due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(JENSEN, LAUREN) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/1/2019. (byl) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent ORDER granting #6 Defendant State of New Jersey Department of Education's Letter request for an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise reply to the complaint through May 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/30/2019. (byl) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Lauren A. Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order for Extension of Time)(JENSEN, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiffs and Montclair Board of Education and Onika Burrowes by ONIKA BURROWES, MONTCLAIR BOARD OF EDUCATION, MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY SCHOOL DISTRICT (DAVIS, BRENT) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/1/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ONIKA BURROWES, MONTCLAIR BOARD OF EDUCATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/1/2019. (JB, ) Modified on 4/16/2019 (JB, ). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant State of New Jersey Department of Education.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JENSEN, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Montclair Board of Education and Onika Burrowes. Attorney BRENT MERRILL DAVIS for ONIKA BURROWES,BRENT MERRILL DAVIS for MONTCLAIR BOARD OF EDUCATION,BRENT MERRILL DAVIS for MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY SCHOOL DISTRICT added. (DAVIS, BRENT) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN AMY JENSEN on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (JENSEN, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MONTCLAIR BD. OF EDUCATION and Onika Burrowes from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-1709-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9571758), filed by MONTCLAIR BD. OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal, #2 Notice to State Court of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHAH, ROSHAN) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less