This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:27:28 (UTC).

Mitic v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Mitic filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael T Morrissey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01869

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael T Morrissey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marija Mitic

Defendants

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Ur Jaddou

Richard R Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James O Hacking, III

Attorney at Hacking Law Practice LLC

10900 Manchester Rd., Ste. 203

St Louis, MO 63122

Defendant Attorneys

Vickie LeDuc

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Baltimore MD

36 S Charles St., 4Th Fl.

Baltimore, MD 21201

Brock Jason Heathcotte

Attorney at US Attorneys Office - Phoenix, AZ

2 Renaissance Square40 N Central Ave., Ste. 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4408

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

(#7) NOTICE by Marija Mitic re #6 Order, #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Consent to Transfer (Hacking, James) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Transfer Case to the USDC for the District of Arizona; Defendants shall file their answer 30 days from the date this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/2/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#13

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - That all parties shall show cause in writing on or before December 14, 2021, why they should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court under 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply with Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If the parties comply with Rule 3.7(b) on or before December 14, 2021 by either consenting to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, this Order to Show Cause will be automatically deemed satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 11/30/21. (MAP) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. the parties shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) proposed case management report no later than 1/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 12/1/21. (DXD) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#21

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ur Jaddou, Richard R Miller, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Heathcotte, Brock) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. the parties shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) proposed case management report no later than 1/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 12/1/21. (DXD) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#19) Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#18) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#16) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - That all parties shall show cause in writing on or before December 14, 2021, why they should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court under 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply with Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If the parties comply with Rule 3.7(b) on or before December 14, 2021 by either consenting to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, this Order to Show Cause will be automatically deemed satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 11/30/21. (MAP) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James O Hacking, III on behalf of Plaintiff Marija Mitic. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Brock Heathcotte appearing for Ur Jaddou, Richard R Miller, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Vickie LeDuc terminated. . (Heathcotte, Brock) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#12) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Election Form Deadline. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-02256 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Transfer Case to the USDC for the District of Arizona; Defendants shall file their answer 30 days from the date this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/2/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Marija Mitic re #6 Order, #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Consent to Transfer (Hacking, James) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Ur Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Richard R. Miller. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/14/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Transfer Case by Ur Jaddou, Richard R. Miller, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marija Mitic. Ur Jaddou served on 9/15/2021, answer due 11/15/2021; Richard R. Miller served on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 9/15/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Richard R. Miller, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 60 days as to Ur Jaddou, Richard R. Miller, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou, Richard R. Miller, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9472146.), filed by Marija Mitic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jaddou, #3 Summons USCIS, #4 Summons Garland, #5 Summons Local USCIS Official, #6 Summons Local US A MD)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from mdd on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brock Jason Heathcotte

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vickie LeDuc