This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 08:41:29 (UTC).

Mitchum v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Mitchum filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. P. Boulee and Regina D Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02863

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

Referral Judge

Regina D Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger Wayne Mitchum

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

American Express Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Powell McClelland, III

Attorney at Law Firm of Joseph P. McClelland, LLC

545 N. Mcdonough Street, Suite 210

Decatur, GA 30030

Defendant Attorneys

Kearstin Harumi Sale

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309-3958

Rebecca Crawford Reynolds

Attorney at Jones Day - Atlanta

1221 Peachtree St. Ne, Suite 400

Atlanta, GA 30361

Michael Adam Merar

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.-Plano

Suite 800, 6900 Dallas Parkway

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Return of Service Executed by Roger Wayne Mitchum. American Express Company served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#14

(#14) Electronic Summons Issued as to American Express Company. (ceo) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#13

(#13) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Roger Wayne Mitchum (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER: The #7 and #9 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer are GRANTED. Trans Union shall respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before September 17, 2021, and Equifax shall do so no later than October 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/18/21. (ceo) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Reynolds, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Merar, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merar, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Sale, Kearstin) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sale, Kearstin) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian shall respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before September 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/17/21. (ceo) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

4 #2

Summons Proof of Service

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Roger Wayne Mitchum. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021; Trans Union, LLC served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service, #2 Summons Proof of Service)(McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Roger Wayne Mitchum. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11113195) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Return of Service Executed by Roger Wayne Mitchum. American Express Company served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Electronic Summons Issued as to American Express Company. (ceo) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Roger Wayne Mitchum (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: The #7 and #9 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer are GRANTED. Trans Union shall respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before September 17, 2021, and Equifax shall do so no later than October 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/18/21. (ceo) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Reynolds, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Merar, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merar, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Sale, Kearstin) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sale, Kearstin) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian shall respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before September 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/17/21. (ceo) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Roger Wayne Mitchum. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021; Trans Union, LLC served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service, #2 Summons Proof of Service)(McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Roger Wayne Mitchum. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Equifax, #2 Summons Trans Union)(ceo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Roger Wayne Mitchum. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11113195) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant