This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2020 at 08:58:36 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Whitmer et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Whitmer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00384

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Mitchell, III

Defendants

Robert Gordon

Gretchen E. Whitmer

Amicus Curiae

Michigan Epidemiologists

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel J. McCarthy

Attorney at Butzel Long PC (Detroit)

150 W Jefferson Ave., Ste. 100

Detroit, MI 48226

Joseph E. Richotte

Attorney at Butzel Long PC (Bloomfield Hills)

41000 Woodward Ave.

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Defendant Attorneys

Kyla Lillian Barranco

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (State Operations)

P.O. Box 30754

Lansing, MI 48909

Christopher M. Allen

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Solicitor General)

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30212

Lansing, MI 48909

John G. Fedynsky

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30736

Lansing, MI 48909

Darrin F. Fowler

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Community Health)

525 W Ottawa, P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Joseph T. Froehlich

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (State Operations)

P.O. Box 30754

Lansing, MI 48909

Joshua O. Booth

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Licensing/Regulation)

525 W Ottawa St., 3Rd Floor, P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Mahrah M. Taufique

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 Fifth Ave., Ste. 7110

New York, NY 10118

Joshua Adam Matz

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 Fifth Ave., Ste. 7110

New York, NY 10118

Raymond P. Tolentino

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 Fifth Ave., Ste. 7110

New York, NY 10118

Jonathan R. Kay

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 Fifth Ave., Ste. 7110

New York, NY 10118

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPLY to response to motion #9 for leave to file Brief of Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Michigan Epidemiologists (Matz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Paul Mitchell, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Michigan Epidemiologists (Matz, Joshua) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER regarding Motion for Leave to File amicus brief #9 and certificate of concurrence; motion held in abeyance pending filing of certificate; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit A - Brief of Amici Curiae Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defenda

#9

(#9) MOTION for leave to file Brief of Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by amicus Michigan Epidemiologists ; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief of Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Matz, Joshua) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (clw). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

8 #10

Exhibit I: South Bay United Pentecostal Church, et al. v. Gavin Newsom,

8 #9

Exhibit H: 05/18/2020 DHHS Order

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of All Defendants (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen E. Whitmer (clw) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #3 (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #3 (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Paul Mitchell, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to response to motion #9 for leave to file Brief of Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Michigan Epidemiologists (Matz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Paul Mitchell, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Michigan Epidemiologists (Matz, Joshua) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER regarding Motion for Leave to File amicus brief #9 and certificate of concurrence; motion held in abeyance pending filing of certificate; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to file Brief of Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by amicus Michigan Epidemiologists ; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief of Michigan Epidemiologists in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Matz, Joshua) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (clw). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mahrah Taufique on behalf of amicus Michigan Epidemiologists (Taufique, Mahrah) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (clw). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonathan R. Kay on behalf of amicus Michigan Epidemiologists (Kay, Jonathan) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (clw). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Raymond P. Tolentino on behalf of amicus Michigan Epidemiologists (Tolentino, Raymond) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (clw). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua Adam Matz on behalf of amicus Michigan Epidemiologists ; party Michigan Epidemiologists added (Matz, Joshua) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (clw). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #7 filed by Robert Gordon, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Martinko, et. al. v. Governor Whitmer, et. al., #3 Exhibit B: World Health Organization, Modes of transmission of virus, #4 Exhibit C: E.O. 2020-17, #5 Exhibit D: E.O. 2020-96, #6 Exhibit E: E.O. 2020-21, #7 Exhibit F: E.O. 2020-110, #8 Exhibit G: E.O. 2020-97, #9 Exhibit H: 05/18/2020 DHHS Order, #10 Exhibit I: South Bay United Pentecostal Church, et al. v. Gavin Newsom,, #11 Exhibit J: TCF Center transformation ahead of schedule, ready for patients) (Ragatzki, Kyla) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Darrin F. Fowler on behalf of defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Fowler, Darrin) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of All Defendants (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph E. Richotte on behalf of plaintiff Paul Mitchell, III (Richotte, Joseph) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen E. Whitmer (clw) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #3 (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Paul Mitchell, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McCarthy, Daniel) Modified text on 5/12/2020 (clw). (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Robert Gordon, Gretchen E. Whitmer (summons not provided) (clw) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number AMIWDC-5205205; Filing fee paid by attorney Daniel J. McCarthy on behalf of plaintiff Paul Mitchell III (jmw) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Paul Mitchell, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond P. Tolentino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Adam Matz