This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2021 at 07:33:08 (UTC).

Mitchell v. National Football League et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against National Football League. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02260

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glenn Wayne Mitchell

College Park, GA 30349

Defendants

National Football League

Roger Goodells

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Terri R. Stewart

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP-ATL

Suite 3500, 1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Order; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; staying case for 30 dys so plaintiff my seek attorney representation granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Roger Goodells Answer due 8/27/2021; National Football League Answer due 8/27/2021. Following the expiration of the 30 day stay, the Court will expect the case to proceed in a timely manner, as set forth in the Federal Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/1/2021. (dob) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend Court Filing by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (dob) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed Titled Motion of Proof by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. Roger Goodells served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; National Football League served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (dob) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion Requesting Defendants Be Allowed Additional Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Roger Goodells, National Football League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stewart, Terri) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, titled, Motion to Request U. S. District Court to assist Plaintiff in Obtaining Legal Representation under Title VII and ADA Filings by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (eop) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Order to have the U.S. Marshals Service the Defendants by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (eop) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to National Football League. (eop) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN!00130333) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Glenn Wayne Mitchell re #8 Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (dob) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Order; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; staying case for 30 dys so plaintiff my seek attorney representation granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Roger Goodells Answer due 8/27/2021; National Football League Answer due 8/27/2021. Following the expiration of the 30 day stay, the Court will expect the case to proceed in a timely manner, as set forth in the Federal Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/1/2021. (dob) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Amend Court Filing by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (dob) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed Titled Motion of Proof by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. Roger Goodells served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; National Football League served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (dob) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion Requesting Defendants Be Allowed Additional Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Roger Goodells, National Football League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stewart, Terri) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION for Order, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (jpa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, titled, Motion to Request U. S. District Court to assist Plaintiff in Obtaining Legal Representation under Title VII and ADA Filings by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (eop) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Order to have the U.S. Marshals Service the Defendants by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (eop) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to National Football League. (eop) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Glenn Wayne Mitchell. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN!00130333) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terri R. Stewart