This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2019 at 07:57:40 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Kone Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Mitchell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kone Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon A. York and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02377

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheri Mitchell

Defendant

Kone Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bobby F. Martin, Jr.

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, PA - Memphis

40 South Main Street, Suite 2600

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

Garrett Hunter O'Brien

Attorney at MCANGUS, GOUDELOCK, COURIE, LLC

5350 Poplar Ave., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Kone Inc. of Service of Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures (O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Sheri Mitchell of Service of Initial Disclosures (Martin, Bobby) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#12

(#12) SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial is set for Monday, 6/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/22/2020. (jrs) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/3/2019. (jjf) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit (Proposed) Scheduling Order

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed) Scheduling Order)(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 7/3/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Intent to Rebut Presumption

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Kone Inc. of Intent to Rebut Presumption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Intent to Rebut Presumption)(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kone Inc..(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Service

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kone Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1854-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3087765), filed by Kone Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by Kone Inc. of Service of Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures (O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE by Sheri Mitchell of Service of Initial Disclosures (Martin, Bobby) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial is set for Monday, 6/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/22/2020. (jrs) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/3/2019. Bobby F. Martin, Jr. appeared for the Plaintiff. Garrett Hunter O'Brien appeared for the Defendant. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 6/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/22/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Cathy Best) (jrs) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/3/2019. (jjf) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed) Scheduling Order)(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 7/3/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Kone Inc. of Intent to Rebut Presumption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Intent to Rebut Presumption)(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kone Inc..(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kone Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1854-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3087765), filed by Kone Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Garrett) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.