This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:01 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Kirby

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Mitchell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kirby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02089

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin L. Mitchell

Defendant

Kaitlyn Marie Kirby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael T. Hua

Attorney at Baker Law Offices, PC

500 S. 8Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Lloyd W. Baker

Attorney at Baker Law Offices

500 S Eighth St

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorney

James Ernest Harper

Attorney at Harper Selim

1707 Village Center Circle, Suite 140

Las Vegas, NV 89134

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, addressed to Michael T Hua. (DRS) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/10/2020. Motions due by 7/10/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kevin L. Mitchell. (Baker, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER Denying without prejudice #8 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#8

(#8) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kevin L. Mitchell. (Baker, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Kevin L. Mitchell. (Baker, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. (Harper, James) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harper, James) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/27/2020.(Harper, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-19-802039, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5801862) by Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harper, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, addressed to Michael T Hua. (DRS) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Michael T. Hua is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/10/2020. Motions due by 7/10/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kevin L. Mitchell. (Baker, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Denying without prejudice #8 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kevin L. Mitchell. (Baker, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Kevin L. Mitchell. (Baker, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. (Harper, James) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harper, James) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/27/2020.(Harper, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Michael T. Hua is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/6/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/21/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (SLD) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-19-802039, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5801862) by Kaitlyn Marie Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harper, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less