This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:26:42 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Exxon Mobil Corp

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Mitchell filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Exxon Mobil Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06876

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kara Mitchell

Defendants

Exxon Mobil Corp

Exxon Mobil Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina W. Abraham

Attorney at Abraham Law & Consulting, LLC

161 N. Clark Streetsuite 4700

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kara Mitchell; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19002109.(Abraham, Christina) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Abraham, Christina) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kara Mitchell by Christina W. Abraham (Abraham, Christina) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance is required). The parties' joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 4/4/2022. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will set a schedule based on the report.Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance is required). The parties' joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 4/4/2022. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will set a schedule based on the report.Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Exxon Mobil Corp (jj, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kara Mitchell by Christina W. Abraham (Abraham, Christina) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Abraham, Christina) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kara Mitchell; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19002109.(Abraham, Christina) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina W. Abraham