This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:29:17 (UTC).

Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC v. Truong

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Truong. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12388

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC

14145 Danielson St.

Poway, CA 92064

Defendants

Kevin Truong

Kevin Truong doing business as Kevin Nguyen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew C. Yost

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

111 Huntington Avenue, Suite 2500

Boston, MA 02199

Trent M. Johnson

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 East Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Jesse Byam-Katzman

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 East Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorneys

Nathaniel J. Lichtin

Attorney at Parker Keough LLLP

51 Winchester Street, Suite 205

Newton, MA 02461

Kenneth R. L. Parker

965 Walnut Street

Newton, MA 02461

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Jesse Byam-Katzman

#10

9 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Trent M. Johnson

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

1 #7

Category Form for New Civil Case

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jesse Byam-Katzman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Trent M. Johnson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. L. Parker on behalf of Kevin Truong (Parker, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jesse Byam-Katzman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8054164 by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jesse Byam-Katzman)(Yost, Andrew) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Trent M. Johnson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8054150 by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Trent M. Johnson)(Yost, Andrew) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Kevin Truong served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Yost, Andrew) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel J. Lichtin on behalf of Kevin Truong (Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand with Certificate of Service by Kevin Truong.(Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Kevin Truong. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing of copyright case. Form submitted to Register of Copyrights via mail on this date. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #1 Complaint,, for $400.00 paid on 11/20/19, receipt number 0101-7981111. (Adam, Lucien) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Snap-On, Inc., Corporate Parent NAPA Auto Parts, Inc. for Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC.. (Yost, Andrew) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kevin Truong Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7983319 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form for New Civil Case)(Yost, Andrew) Modified on 11/26/2019: to remove AO 121 and properly file in own entry (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth R. L. Parker