This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2022 at 09:27:10 (UTC).

Mitchell et al v. Underwriters at Lloyds London

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Mitchell filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Underwriters at Lloyds London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02558

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Calvin Steve Mitchell

Cathy Mitchell

Defendant

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell J Stutes, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin William Welsh

Heather Shawn Duplantis

Jordan Paul Zeringue

Virginia Y Dodd

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Underwriters at Lloyds London. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin Steve Mitchell, Cathy Mitchell. Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. (aty,Stutes, Russell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London incorrectly named as Underwriters at Lloyds London. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kevin William Welsh added to party Underwriters at Lloyds London(pty:dft))(aty,Welsh, Kevin) Modified filer on 9/14/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

5 #1

Proposed order

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Kevin William Welsh on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/28/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London answer due 10/5/2022; Underwriters at Lloyds London answer due 10/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/15/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London identifying Corporate Parent Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. BA1900956-0155, Corporate Parent Syndicate HIS 33, Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London.(aty,Zeringue, Jordan) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London.(aty,Zeringue, Jordan) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London identifying Corporate Parent Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. BA1900956-0155, Corporate Parent Syndicate HIS 33, Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London answer due 10/5/2022; Underwriters at Lloyds London answer due 10/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/15/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Kevin William Welsh on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/28/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London incorrectly named as Underwriters at Lloyds London. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kevin William Welsh added to party Underwriters at Lloyds London(pty:dft))(aty,Welsh, Kevin) Modified filer on 9/14/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin Steve Mitchell, Cathy Mitchell. Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. (aty,Stutes, Russell) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Underwriters at Lloyds London. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Underwriters at Lloyds London (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5208142) filed by Calvin Steve Mitchell, Cathy Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Russell J Stutes, Jr added to party Calvin Steve Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney Russell J Stutes, Jr added to party Cathy Mitchell(pty:pla))(aty,Stutes, Russell) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less