This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2019 at 08:10:13 (UTC).

Mitchell et al v. Nolan Transportation Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 Mitchell filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02812

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Ragans

Bryson Mitchell

Tyler Winters

Kirk Heilman

Defendant

Nolan Transportation Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mitchell Douglas Benjamin

Attorney at DeLong Caldwell Bridgers Fitzpatrick & Benjamin, LLC

101 Marietta Street, Nw, 2650 Centennial Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303

Matthew Wilson Herrington

Attorney at DeLong Caldwell Bridgers Fitzpatrick & Benjamin, LLC

101 Marietta Street, Nw, 2650 Centennial Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303

Michael Arthur Brown

Attorney at The Law Offices of Peter T. Nicholl

Suite 1700, 36 S. Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Benjamin Leon Davis, III

Attorney at The Law Offices of Peter T. Nicholl

Suite 1700, 36 S. Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Defendant Attorneys

Joel Griswold

Attorney at Deering & Deering, P.C.

1856 Tristan Dr., Se

Smyrna, GA 30080-6472

Brian Michael Harris

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP-GA

Suite 2400, 1170 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay Pending Individual Arbitration. The case is STAYED pending the conclusion of the individual arbitrations. The Court shall retain jurisdiction for the purpose of entering orders regarding the enforcement of the arbitration awards and/or approving settlements between the Parties. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/2/19. (bnp) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit A- Proposed Agreed Order

#15

(#15) Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Individual Arbitration by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Agreed Order)(Griswold, Joel) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Certificate of Compliance) by Matthew Wilson Herrington on behalf of Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 7-18, 2019, by Matthew Wilson Herrington. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

12 #1

Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend)(Harris, Brian) Modified on 7/17/2019 to edit docket text(bnp). (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE REGARDING FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/24/19. (bnw) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/24/19. (bnw) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (rlb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

ORDER by docket entry only granting #10 , #11 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice and granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Nolan Transportation Group, LLC Answer due 8/7/2019. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/17/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (bnp) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay Pending Individual Arbitration. The case is STAYED pending the conclusion of the individual arbitrations. The Court shall retain jurisdiction for the purpose of entering orders regarding the enforcement of the arbitration awards and/or approving settlements between the Parties. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/2/19. (bnp) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Individual Arbitration by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Agreed Order)(Griswold, Joel) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Certificate of Compliance) by Matthew Wilson Herrington on behalf of Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 7-18, 2019, by Matthew Wilson Herrington. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER by docket entry only granting #10 , #11 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice and granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Nolan Transportation Group, LLC Answer due 8/7/2019. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/17/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend)(Harris, Brian) Modified on 7/17/2019 to edit docket text(bnp). (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Arthur Brown Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Michael Arthur Brown added appearing on behalf of Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters (pmb) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Leon Davis III Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Benjamin Leon Davis, III added appearing on behalf of Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters (pmb) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Arthur Brown Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Arthur Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8770025). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service Executed by Robert Ragans, Bryson Mitchell, Tyler Winters, Kirk Heilman. Nolan Transportation Group, LLC served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Leon Davis III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8770052). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Arthur Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8770025). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Kirk Heilman, Bryson Mitchell, Robert Ragans, Tyler Winters. (Herrington, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE REGARDING FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/24/19. (bnw) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/24/19. (bnw) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Nolan Transportation Group, LLC. (rlb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Collective Action Complaint for Wages Owed with Jury Demand filed by Robert Ragans, Bryson Mitchell, Tyler Winters and Kirk Heilman. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8741249) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nolan Transportation Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel Griswold