This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:30:32 (UTC).

Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance v. Hosemann

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Hosemann. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are F. Keith Ball and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00831

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance

Defendant

Delbert Hosemann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beth L. Orlansky

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE - Jackson

P. O. Box 1023, 5 Old River Place, Ste. 203 (39202)

Jackson, MS 39215-1023

Ronald B. Turovsky - PHV

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP - Los Angeles

11355 W. Olympic Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Alexandra Hill - PHV

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP - Los Angeles

11355 W. Olympic Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90064

John Michael Powers - PHV

Attorney at LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW

1500 K St., Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20009

Emil Petrossian - PHV

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP - Los Angeles

11355 W. Olympic Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorney

Justin L. Matheny-State Gov

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

P. O. Box 220, 550 High Street (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0220

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Delbert Hosemann.(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Delbert Hosemann (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Matheny-State Gov on behalf of Delbert Hosemann (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing for Alexandra Hill

#10

(#10) MOTION for Alexandra Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155443) by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Alexandra Hill)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

9 #1

Certificate of Good Standing for Emil Petrossian

#9

(#9) MOTION for Emil Petrossian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155439) by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Emil Petrossian)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing for Ronald B. Turovsky

#8

(#8) MOTION for Ronald B. Turovsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155437) by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Ronald B. Turovsky)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit A - Powers' certificates of good standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for John Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Powers' certificates of good standing)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Mississippi Voter Registration Instructions

1 #4

Exhibit D - Mississippi Mail-In Voter Registration Application

1 #3

Exhibit C - Excerpt from Mississippis Section 5 Submission

1 #2

Exhibit B - 12/26/18 Letter from Anna Moak, Sr. Counsel, Miss. Secy of States Of

1 #1

Exhibit A - MIRA Flyer

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Delbert Hosemann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4141417), filed by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MIRA Flyer, #2 Exhibit B - 12/26/18 Letter from Anna Moak, Sr. Counsel, Miss. Secy of States Of, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt from Mississippis Section 5 Submission, #4 Exhibit D - Mississippi Mail-In Voter Registration Application, #5 Exhibit E - Mississippi Voter Registration Instructions, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/18/2019) (cwl). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Delbert Hosemann.(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That John Powers, Ronald B. Turovsky, Emil Petrossian and Alexandra Hill be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/10/2019. (JEJ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Motion #12 for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Hosemann Answer due 1/8/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/6/2019. (dcw) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Delbert Hosemann (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Matheny-State Gov on behalf of Delbert Hosemann (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Alexandra Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155443) by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Alexandra Hill)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Emil Petrossian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155439) by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Emil Petrossian)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Ronald B. Turovsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4155437) by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Ronald B. Turovsky)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for John Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Powers' certificates of good standing)(Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice fee paid for John Powers receipt number 0538-4149579 $ 100 (Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance. Delbert Hosemann served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (LAT) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance. Delbert Hosemann served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Orlansky, Beth) Modified on 11/21/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Incorrect event chosen. This document shouldhave been docketed as Summons returned executed. Also, a return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (LAT) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Beth Orlansky served on Attorney General on 11-18-19, filed by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance. (Orlansky, Beth) Modified on 11/21/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance (Orlansky, Beth) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Delbert Hosemann. (cwl) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Delbert Hosemann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4141417), filed by Mississippi Immigrants Rights Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MIRA Flyer, #2 Exhibit B - 12/26/18 Letter from Anna Moak, Sr. Counsel, Miss. Secy of States Of, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt from Mississippis Section 5 Submission, #4 Exhibit D - Mississippi Mail-In Voter Registration Application, #5 Exhibit E - Mississippi Voter Registration Instructions, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/18/2019) (cwl). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less